Raffel Systems LLC v. Bob's Discount Furniture LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raffel Systems LLC
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Macy's Inc and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01167
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER : The court finding good cause, the parties' stipulated motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #7 ) is granted. The defendants may answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint no later than December 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/23/2021 (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Hao Tan on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Hao Tan (Tan, Hao)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Lindinger on behalf of Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael L. Lindinger (Lindinger, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M Hnath on behalf of Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Gary M. Hnath (Hnath, Gary)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark Bakewell on behalf of Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Clark S. Bakewell (Bakewell, Clark)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Wuest on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew M. Wuest (Wuest, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Gregor, Jennifer)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Gregor on behalf of Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer L. Gregor (Gregor, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Re-Assign Case by Raffel Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheller, John)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 10 days; the form is available #here. (mlm)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Re-Issued as to Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. (mlm)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Raffel Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons - Costco Wholesale Corporation, #2 Summons Amended Summons - Macy's, Inc.)(Scheller, John)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (mlm)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Bob's Discount Furniture LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Macy's Inc. (mlm)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Raffel Systems LLC. (Scheller, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Raffel Systems LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3943105) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent 11,089,701, #2 Exhibit 2 - BDF infringing products, #3 Exhibit 3 - BDF claim chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Macy's infringing products, #5 Exhibit 5 - Macy's claim chart, #6 Exhibit 6 - Costco infringing products, #7 Exhibit 7 - Costco claim chart, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons - Bob's Discount Furniture, LLC, #10 Summons Summons - Macy's, Inc., #11 Summons Summons - Costco Wholesale Corporation)(Scheller, John)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raffel Systems LLC v. Bob's Discount Furniture LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raffel Systems LLC
Represented By: John C Scheller
Represented By: David A Casimir
Represented By: Kenneth M Albridge, III
Represented By: Tyler J Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Discount Furniture LLC
Represented By: Clark Bakewell
Represented By: Gary M Hnath
Represented By: Hao Tan
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michael Louis Lindinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Inc
Represented By: Clark Bakewell
Represented By: Gary M Hnath
Represented By: Hao Tan
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michael Louis Lindinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Clark Bakewell
Represented By: Gary M Hnath
Represented By: Hao Tan
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Michael Louis Lindinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?