Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund et al v. Cornerstone Pavers LLC
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund, Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund, Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund, Terrance E McGowan, International Union Of Operating Engineers National Training Fund, James T Callahan, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, Michael A Crabtree and International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139
Defendant: Cornerstone Pavers, LLC and Cornerstone Pavers LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01240
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Mason, L)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. The court will initiate the call. No later than 12:00 PM the day prior to the hearing, counsel shall notify chambers at 414-297-1122 of the direct telephone number at which they may be reached. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 12/28/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cl)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Cornerstone Pavers LLC.(Borton, Austin)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/24/2021. Upon consideration of #7 the parties' stipulation to extend, the Court grants the stipulation. Defendant has until December 2, 2021 to file an answer or motion to Plaintiffs' complaint. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
November 19, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #8 MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Answer filed by Cornerstone Pavers LLC ; This document should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filedThe incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER on stipulation to extend time MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Answer by Cornerstone Pavers LLC. (Borton, Austin) Modified on 11/19/2021 (rcm).
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Cornerstone Pavers LLC. (Borton, Austin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin B Borton on behalf of Cornerstone Pavers LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Austin Borton (Borton, Austin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cornerstone Pavers LLC served on 10/28/2021. (Buchko, Cynthia)
October 26, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
October 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Cornerstone Pavers LLC. (kah)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by L Katie Mason on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: L. Katie Mason (Mason, L)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Buchko, Cynthia)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Buchko, Cynthia)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornerstone Pavers, LLC by James T Callahan, Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139, Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund, Michael A Crabtree, Terrance E McGowan, Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund, International Union Of Operating Engineers National Training Fund. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3956555) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Buchko, Cynthia)
October 25, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund et al v. Cornerstone Pavers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 139 Health Benefit Fund
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Represented By: Cynthia L Buchko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Operating Engineers Skill Improvement and Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Represented By: Cynthia L Buchko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Labor Management Work Preservation Fund
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Represented By: Cynthia L Buchko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance E McGowan
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union Of Operating Engineers National Training Fund
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Callahan
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Crabtree
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 139
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Pavers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Pavers LLC
Represented By: Austin B Borton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?