Herr v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Melissa Herr
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01258
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 11/5/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Brett H Ludwig no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(MP)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Establishing Appeal Procedure entered by Judge Brett H Ludwig. Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 1/3/2022;Plaintiff's brief due 2/14/2022;Defendant's response due 3/28/2022;Plaintiff's reply due 4/12/2022. (cc: all counsel) (kmm)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 11/1/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
November 1, 2021 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Melissa Herr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Melissa Herr. (Brzezinski, James)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Melissa Herr. (Brzezinski, James)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Melissa Herr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brzezinski, James)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herr v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Herr
Represented By: James M Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?