Wright, Tania v. The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tania Evette Wright
Defendant: The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01324
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for a More Definite Statement by The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (Moran, Patrick)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION Renewed Motion for a More Definite Statement by The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (Moran, Patrick)
December 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)
December 7, 2021 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tania Evette Wright. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
December 3, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (Moran, Patrick)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Moran, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00280. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer the case for improper venue, Dkt. #10 , is GRANTED in part. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/17/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
November 17, 2021 NOTICE TO DEFENDANT - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should be filed. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (lz)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 Brief in Reply by Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss, (Moran, Patrick),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Tania Evette Wright re: #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Court's 10/13/2021 NEF Setting Briefing Schedule, #2 Copy of Dkt. #4 - Opinion and Order, dated 8/5/2021, #3 Copy of Dkt. #3 - Order, dated 4/26/2021, #4 Email to Plaintiff from Tamarra Coleman, dated 10/22/2020, #5 Email from Plaintiff to Tamarra Coleman, dated 10/12/2020, #6 Letter from Attorney Colin B. Good, dated April 9, 2021, to Tamarra Coleman, #7 Envelope) (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Affidavit of Tamarra Coleman filed by Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. re: #10 Motion to Dismiss, (Moran, Patrick) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS for Improper Venue and for a More Definite Statement. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 11/3/2021. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 11/15/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS for Improper Venue and for a More Definite Statement by Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Tamarra Coleman) (Moran, Patrick),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Frasor Moran for Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. (Moran, Patrick),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Marshal Service Return Executed as to The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Catherine S Sharkey re #6 Waiver of Service Executed mailed to Plaintiff Tania Evette Wright on 9/1/2021. (Allen, Shannon),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.. The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Allen, Shannon),(ps)[Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. Forwarded to U.S. Marshals for Service. (Attachments: #1 Marshals Service Form) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendant The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc. Service to be made by USMS. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/5/2021. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/26/2021. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tania Evette Wright. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Tania Evette Wright. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Letter from Hawks Quindel S.C Regarding Employment Matter, #2 Picture regarding time off request, #3 Letter from Racine County DHS dated 03-24-21, #4 Letter from Racine County DHS dated 03-29-21, #5 Letter from Anchor EAP LLC dated 04-05-21, #6 Monthly Expenses, #7 Incidents and Resolution Proposals, #8 Letter from Department of Workforce Development Equal Rights Division dated 01-22-21, #9 Charge of Discrimination No 443-2021-00197 Documents, #10 Information Related to Filing Suit Under the Laws Enforced by the EEOC, #11 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright, Tania v. The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania Evette Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shalom Center of Interfaith Network of Kenosha County, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick F Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?