PBS Lender LLC v. New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC
Plaintiff: PBS Lender, LLC and PBS Lender LLC
Defendant: New Punch Bowl Milwaukee, LLC and New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01408
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 2/8/2022 granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel)(sf)
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S (I) MOTION TO DISMISS, (II) MOTION TO REFER CASE TO BANKRUPTCY COURT, AND (III) JURISDICTION BRIEF by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkes, Gregory)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by PBS Lender LLC re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Refer Action to U.S. Bankruptcy Court . (Kerkman, Jerome)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by PBS Lender LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kerkman, Jerome)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY filed by PBS Lender LLC re #11 Response (Non-Motion), #9 Response (Non-Motion), #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Ross)(Kerkman, Jerome)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by PBS Lender LLC Notice of Appearance (Schmit, Evan)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC re #9 Response (Non-Motion), #1 Notice of Removal, / DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF THIS COURT'S JURISDICTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Order re: Stay)(Wilkes, Gregory)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 1/5/2022: Court discussed pending motions and issues in the case. Court ordered deadlines as stated on the record. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (rcm)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by PBS Lender LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Objection to Removal of this Case from the Wisconsin Circuit Court for Milwaukee County (Kerkman, Jerome)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by PBS Lender LLC. (Kerkman, Jerome)
December 27, 2021 ZOOM INFORMATION for Status Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 10:30am before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph.#Click here to Join ZoomGov MeetingMeeting ID: 160 706 2327and Password: 519856Dial in: #+1-669-254-5252 or #+1-646-828-7666 (cc: all counsel) (rcm)
December 27, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 10:30 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
December 23, 2021 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (rcm)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wilkes, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Refer Action to U.S. Bankruptcy Court by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC. (Wilkes, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support filed by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wilkes, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC. (Wilkes, Gregory)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PBS Lender LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Niemuth, Averi)
December 14, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee, LLC. (Hendrix, Nicholas)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Punch Bowl Milwaukee, LLC from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21-CV-7193 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3994799) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit 4 - Amended Adversary Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Debtor's Schedule)(Wilkes, Gregory)
December 13, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PBS Lender LLC v. New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBS Lender, LLC
Represented By: Averi A Niemuth
Represented By: Evan P Schmit
Represented By: Jerome R Kerkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBS Lender LLC
Represented By: Averi A Niemuth
Represented By: Evan P Schmit
Represented By: Jerome R Kerkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Punch Bowl Milwaukee, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Hendrix
Represented By: Gregory M Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Punch Bowl Milwaukee LLC
Represented By: Emma L Persson
Represented By: Nicholas J Hendrix
Represented By: Gregory M Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?