United States of America v. Eilman et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Chad Eilman, Jeffrey Eilman and Christine Neigum
Case Number: 2:2021cv01432
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/3/2022 GRANTING #15 Stipulated Motion for Discovery Order. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/3/2022 GRANTING #15 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
February 2, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Att A - Joint Proposed Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Att B - Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery)(Reid, Arielle)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/26/2022. Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/4/2022. Fact discovery due by 8/4/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 9/6/2022. Defendants Expert Witness List due by 11/7/2022. Expert Discovery due by 1/6/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and enter access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2022. Case deadlines set. Scheduling order to issue. (Tape #ATT Conf 10:30-10:35 am) (lz)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Eilman - Waiver sent on 12/21/2021. (Reid, Arielle)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christine Neigum - Waiver sent on 12/21/2021. (Reid, Arielle)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Eilman - Waiver sent on 12/21/2021. (Reid, Arielle)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Att A - Joint Proposed Protective Order, #2 Att B - Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery)(Reid, Arielle)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 10:30 AM (CT) before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and enter access code 8322317# to join the call. A Rule 26(f) report shall be filed by 1/18/2022. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ratzel, James)
December 29, 2021 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)
December 29, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Ratzel, James)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Reid, Arielle)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by United States of America.(Reid, Arielle)
December 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to Chad Eilman, Jeffrey Eilman, Christine Neigum. (mlm)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by United States of America (Larsen, Christian)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of United States of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian)
December 17, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by United States of America. (Reid, Arielle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eilman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arielle Reid
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Eilman
Represented By: Herschel Brodkey
Represented By: James C Ratzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Eilman
Represented By: Herschel Brodkey
Represented By: James C Ratzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Neigum
Represented By: Herschel Brodkey
Represented By: James C Ratzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?