Junco v. Advocate Aurora Health
Plaintiff: Bryant Junco
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health
Case Number: 2:2021cv01461
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bryant Junco. (rcm)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Advocate Aurora Health filed by Bryant Junco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(rcm)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bryant Junco. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (rcm)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/3/2022. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket #2 ) be and the same is hereby DENIED without prejudice; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order on or before January 31, 2022 or this action will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff choose to refile a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must do so on or before January 31, 2022; otherwise, Plaintiff must pay the filing fee to proceed with this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(rcm)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Bryant Junco re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (rcm)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bryant Junco. (rcm)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Advocate Aurora Health filed by Bryant Junco with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Junco v. Advocate Aurora Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Junco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?