William K Langfan Revocable Trust v. Foot Locker Specialty Inc
Plaintiff: William K Langfan Revocable Trust
Defendant: Foot Locker Inc and Foot Locker Specialty Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00017
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Foot Locker Specialty Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bosack, Sean)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Bezier on behalf of Foot Locker Specialty Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Bezier (Bezier, Nicholas)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foot Locker Specialty Inc - Waiver sent on 1/18/2022. (Bazelon, Adam)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean O Bosack on behalf of Foot Locker Specialty Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean O'D. Bosack (Bosack, Sean)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Foot Locker Inc filed by William K Langfan Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons)(Bazelon, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2022: #2 Exhibit A) (asc).
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by William K Langfan Revocable Trust. (Bazelon, Adam)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William K Langfan Revocable Trust. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bazelon, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Foot Locker Inc by William K Langfan Revocable Trust. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4012065)(Bazelon, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A) (asc).
January 7, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
January 7, 2022 Summons Issued as to Foot Locker Inc. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William K Langfan Revocable Trust v. Foot Locker Specialty Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William K Langfan Revocable Trust
Represented By: Christopher T Koehnke
Represented By: Adam S Bazelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Specialty Inc
Represented By: Nicholas J Bezier
Represented By: Sean O Bosack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?