Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Ltd, Midea America Corp, Grand Appliance Inc and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00033
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph M. Mirabella in Support of Motion for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Registered Agent)(Mirabella, Joseph)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mirabella, Joseph)
February 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C McGaver on behalf of Grand Appliance Inc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven C. McGaver (McGaver, Steven)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Grand Appliance Inc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Brennan, Patrick)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Brennan on behalf of Grand Appliance Inc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick W Brennan (Brennan, Patrick)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ATTACHMENTS Civil L.R. Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mirabella, Joseph) Modified on 1/12/2022 (rcm).
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mirabella, Joseph) Modified on 1/12/2022 (rcm).
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4015673)(Mirabella, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
January 12, 2022 Case Opening Modifications; The following modifications have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Parties should not have punctuation and their addresses should not be added. Summons should be filed as attachments to the complaint. Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as an attachment to the complaint. Disclosure Statement should be filed as the Disclosure Statement event. Please do not re-file any of these documents ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
January 12, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Mario Mirabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD Midea Air Conditioning Equipment Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Appliance Inc
Represented By: Patrick W Brennan
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick W Brennan
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?