Ball v. Landmark Credit Union
Plaintiff: Christopher Ball
Defendant: Landmark Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2022cv00069
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed as to defendant Landmark Credit Union; waiver filed on PACER (jcl)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Landmark Credit Union - Waiver sent on 2/14/2022. (Wittenberg, Christa)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christa D Wittenberg on behalf of Landmark Credit Union. Attorney(s) appearing: Christa D. Wittenberg (Wittenberg, Christa)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christopher Ball. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent form to US Marshal for service upon the defendant (jcl)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/27/22 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christopher Ball. (jcl)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Landmark Credit Union filed by Christopher Ball. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Duffin. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Landmark Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Credit Union
Represented By: Christa D Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?