Thomas v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Thomas, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services and Medicare
Defendant: Walmart Inc, Stanley Black and Decker, Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Stanley Black & Decker Inc and Black and Decker Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00072
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Vincent Vigil on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Walmart Inc.Attorney Vincent Vigil to be termed. (Vigil, Vincent)
March 11, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan filed by Black and Decker Inc, Stanley Black & Decker Inc, Valerie Thomas, Wal-Mart Associates Inc and Walmart Inc. (vkb)
March 2, 2022 As of 3/2/2022, all Defendants in this matter have appeared and submitted answers. The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint Rule 26 plan by 3/11/2022. The Court will then issue a written trial scheduling order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(A). The parties should contact chambers if they have any questions. (cc: all counsel) (cl)
March 1, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Black and Decker Inc, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carlson, Donald)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Black and Decker Inc, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court answer)(Carlson, Donald)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald H Carlson on behalf of Black and Decker Inc, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Donald H. Carlson (Carlson, Donald)
February 21, 2022 Filing 8 CLAIM DHS Notice of Lien by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Streck, Jeremiah)
February 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Streck on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremiah L. Streck (Streck, Jeremiah)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Walmart Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pastrana, Carlos)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Walmart Inc.(Pastrana, Carlos)
January 21, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been added - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Inc. (Pastrana, Carlos)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Walmart Inc. NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Process of Service)(Pastrana, Carlos)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Christopher Zimmerman regarding Admission and ECF registration (jcl)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc from Milwaukee Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021CV006851 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4021966) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Process of Service)(Pastrana, Carlos)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Thomas
Represented By: Christopher L Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Jeremiah Streck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Vincent Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black and Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Vincent Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker Inc
Represented By: Donald H Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and Decker Inc
Represented By: Donald H Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?