Valoe v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Danielle M Valoe
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Johnathan Paul, Kristina Mallek and Thomas Wilson
Case Number: 2:2022cv00182
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from plaintiff re: summons. (amb)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST to update nature of suit by Danielle M Valoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amb)
February 15, 2022 Docket Annotation: Plaintiff mailed notice of case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper along with Pro Se Litigants guide. (lz)
February 15, 2022 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Danielle M Valoe. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Danielle M Valoe. (lz)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT filed by Danielle M Valoe with Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company, Johnathan Paul, Kristina Mallek and Thomas Wilson. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (lz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valoe v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle M Valoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Mallek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?