Ferguson v. Milwaukee County Probate Court et al
Plaintiff: Charles E Ferguson
Defendant: Milwaukee County Probate Court, Judge Robert Meich and Anna Hodges
Case Number: 2:2022cv00241
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/22/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Charles Ferguson)(cb)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/22/2022. #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee GRANTED; plaintiff to pay $350 fee as he is able. Case DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, because defendant Meich is immune from suit, because Rooker-Feldman doctrine prohibits relief. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Charles Ferguson)(cb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Charles E Ferguson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (asc)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Charles E Ferguson. (asc)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles E Ferguson. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Milwaukee County Probate Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Probate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert Meich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?