Jeffries-Wright v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY
Plaintiff: Karen D. Jeffries-Wright and Karen D Jeffries-Wright
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, New York, NY and The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY
3Rd Party Defendant: Kimberly Jeffries
Case Number: 2:2022cv00303
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File , The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America's Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint for Interpleader by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint for Interpleader)(Herring, Jacqueline)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY re #10 MOTION Motion for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge MOTION for Discharge , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America's Combined Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge and Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Herring, Jacqueline)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Karen D Jeffries-Wright re #10 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge MOTION for Discharge , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)
April 21, 2022 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (mlm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Karen D Jeffries-Wright. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Karen D Jeffries-Wright re #10 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge and MOTION for Discharge and #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (mlm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022: #1 Envelope) (mlm).
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY re #10 MOTION Motion for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge MOTION for Discharge , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , Combined Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge, and Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Herring, Jacqueline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY. (Attachments: #1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(c), (d) and (e), #2 Civil L.R. 56(a), (b) and 7)(Herring, Jacqueline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION Motion for Interpleader Deposit and Discharge , MOTION for Discharge by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY. (Attachments: #1 Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(c), (d) and (e), #2 Civil L.R. 56(a), (b) and 7)(Herring, Jacqueline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY against (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate Booklet, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - February 17, 2008 Beneficiary Form, #5 Exhibit E - January 3, 2022 Claim Form, #6 Exhibit F - January 15, 2022 Claim Form)(Herring, Jacqueline)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY against Karen D. Jeffries-Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate Booklet, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - February 17, 2008 Beneficiary Form, #5 Exhibit E - January 3, 2022 Claim Form, #6 Exhibit F - January 15, 2022 Claim Form)(Herring, Jacqueline)
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mlm)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Herring, Jacqueline)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/16/2022. The court finding good cause, the defendant's motion for additional time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED. The defendant shall file its responsive pleading no later than April 6, 2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Guardian Life Insurance Company of America's Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Jacqueline)
March 10, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, New York, NY. (Herring, Jacqueline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, New York, NY. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacqueline J. Herring (Herring, Jacqueline)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, New York, NY from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Wisconsin, Case Number: 2022SC004722 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4060052) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Milwaukee County Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Milwaukee County Notice of Hearing, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Policy, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Jacqueline) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2022) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries-Wright v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D. Jeffries-Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D Jeffries-Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, New York, NY
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America New York NY
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kimberly Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?