Milwaukee World Trading LLC v. Kapsch et al
Plaintiff: Milwaukee World Trading LLC
Defendant: Michael Kapsch, Patrick Maloney, Dawley Chris, IIGNA, Mizuho Bank USA, Barclays Bank Delaware and Chris Dawley
Case Number: 2:2022cv00322
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/12/2022 re #11 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Michael Kapsch. No opposition has been filed to the motion to withdraw. The court FINDS that defendant's counsel has shown good cause and GRANTS the motion for withdrawal. The court ORDERS that representation of defendant Kapsch by the law firm of DeWitt LLP and Attorneys Liotta, Meiners and Allen is TERMINATED. The court ORDERS that counsel must provide proof that the defendant was notified of this order and must provide to the court defendant Kapsch's mailing address. As indicated in the court's text only order of May 11, 2022, dkt. no. 27, defendant Kapsch must file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint within 21 days of this order. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/11/2022 re #26 Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion of Defendant Michael Kapsch for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint. The court GRANTS the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Kapsch to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint is EXTENDED until 21 days after the court issues a decision on the defendant's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 26 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Michael Kapsch. (Allen, Shannon)
May 6, 2022 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Milwaukee World Trading LLC.(Mamalakis, Emmanuel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 24 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Milwaukee World Trading LLC. (Mamalakis, Emmanuel) Modified on 5/6/2022 (amb).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/29/2022. The court GRANTS defendants Dawley and IIGNA's letter request for clarification. Dkt. No. 21. The court ORDERS that the deadline set in its order dated April 27, 2022, dkt. no. 18, is controlling. The deadline for the plaintiff to file either an amended complaint or a response to defendants Dawley and IIGNA's motion to dismiss is May 17, 2002. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/29/2022 re #19 Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion of Defendant Michael Kapsch for a Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The plaintiff does not oppose defendant Kapsch's motion. Dkt. No. 20. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion and ORDERS that the time for defendant Kapsch to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until 21 days after the court issues a decision on the defendant's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 28, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER from Mark Maciolek requesting clarification of scheduling orders R. 13 and R. 18. (Maciolek, Mark)
April 28, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER from Atty Jeff Liotta RE second extension. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2022 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Michael Kapsch. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/27/2022. By end of day 5/17/2022, plaintiff to file either amended complaint or response to defendants Dawley and IIGNA's motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 27, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions by Chris Dawley, IIGNA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of Attorney Scheef in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #3 Exhibit A - Rule 11 Letter to Attorney Mamalakis, #4 Exhibit A-1 - Declaration of Patrick Maloney, #5 Exhibit A-2 - Declaration of Christopher Dawley, #6 Exhibit B - Rule 11 Letter to Attorney Scheef)(Maciolek, Mark)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Chris Dawley, IIGNA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Declaration of Attorney Scheef, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick Maloney, #4 Declaration of Christopher T. Dawley)(Maciolek, Mark)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scheef on behalf of Chris Dawley, IIGNA. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert W. Scheef (Scheef, Robert)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel; Text of Proposed Order Approving Withdrawal of Counsel, Declaration of Shannon A. Allen on April 23, 2022 by Michael Kapsch (Allen, Shannon)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/22/2022 re #10 Stipulation. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. The court ORDERS that the time for defendants Dawley and IIGNA to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 9, 2022; the plaintiff shall file a response to any motion within 14 days of the filing of the motion; defendants Dawley and IIGNA shall file any reply within 7 days of the filing of the response; no sur-replies shall be filed, unless ordered by the court. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Shannon A. Allen (Meiners, Deborah)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Kapsch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Withdrawal Of Counsel For Defendant Michael Kapsch)(Meiners, Deborah)
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Chris Dawley, IIGNA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maciolek, Mark)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P Maciolek on behalf of Chris Dawley, IIGNA. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark P. Maciolek (Maciolek, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/6/2022 re #6 Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion of Defendant Michael Kapsch for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The court GRANTS defendant Kapsch's unopposed (see dkt. no. 7) motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Kapsch to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 5, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 6, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant Michael Kapsch requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from Jeffrey Liotta . (Liotta, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Michael Kapsch. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Allen on behalf of Michael Kapsch. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon A. Allen, Jeffrey J. Liotta, Deborah C. Meiners (Allen, Shannon)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah C Meiners on behalf of Michael Kapsch. Attorney(s) appearing: Deborah C. Meiners, Jeffrey J. Liotta, Shannon A. Allen (Meiners, Deborah)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Liotta on behalf of Michael Kapsch. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey J. Liotta, Deborah C. Meiners, Shannon A. Allen (Liotta, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milwaukee World Trading LLC. Michael Kapsch served on 3/15/2022. (Mamalakis, Emmanuel)
March 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank Delaware, Michael Kapsch, Mizuho Bank USA. (amb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Milwaukee World Trading LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number BWIEDC-4063619) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Mamalakis, Emmanuel)
March 14, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milwaukee World Trading LLC v. Kapsch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milwaukee World Trading LLC
Represented By: Emmanuel M Mamalakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kapsch
Represented By: Deborah C Meiners
Represented By: Jeffrey J Liotta
Represented By: Shannon A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawley Chris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IIGNA
Represented By: Mark P Maciolek
Represented By: Robert Scheef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dawley
Represented By: Mark P Maciolek
Represented By: Robert Scheef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?