Blakeley v. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Blakeley
Defendant: National Collegiate Student Loan Trust, National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust, National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4, Wilmington Trust Company and NCT a de facto entity doing business as National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4
Case Number: 2:2022cv00342
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by NCT re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alltmont, Michael) Modified on 5/6/2022 (bx).
May 5, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wilmington Trust Company re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Pearson, Eric)
May 5, 2022 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wilmington Trust Company. (Pearson, Eric)
May 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G Pearson on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric G. Pearson (Pearson, Eric)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Shriner, Jr on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr. (Shriner, Thomas)
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by NCT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by NCSLT 2006-4, improperly named in the Complaint as "NCT" . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delaware Corporation Search Results for 15 Trusts, #2 Exhibit B - Delaware Corporation Zero Search Results)(Marcus, Morgan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alltmont on behalf of National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust, National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael D. Alltmont (Alltmont, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by NCT of Filing Supplemental State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents - Part 2)(Marcus, Morgan)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Matthew Blakeley. (Welcenbach, Robert)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Matthew Blakeley re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by NCSLT 2006-4, improperly named in the Complaint as "NCT" . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Matthew Blakeley)(Welcenbach, Robert)
April 12, 2022 Docket Annotation: Attorney Andrew E. Cunningham has filed a notice of withdrawal pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(e)(1). He also requests an order granting him leave to withdrawal. However, a notice of withdrawal under Civil Local Rule 7.1(e)(1) is effective upon filing. Therefore, I will not sign an order to that effect. (KMR)
April 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayle Marie Van Hoose on behalf of National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I. Attorney(s) appearing: Dayle M. Van Hoose (Van Hoose, Dayle)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NCT. (Cunningham, Andrew)
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. NCT served on 2/24/2022; Wilmington Trust Company served on 2/24/2022. (Welcenbach, Robert)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Welcenbach, Robert)
March 24, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Answer to Complaint; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. #7 MOTION to Dismiss by NCSLT 2006-4, improperly named in the Complaint as "NCT" filed by NCT. The Memorandum to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by NCSLT 2006-4, improperly named in the Complaint as "NCT" by NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cunningham, Andrew)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NCSLT 2006-4, improperly named in the Complaint as "NCT" by NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4.(Cunningham, Andrew)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4 of Service of docket no. 3 Notice of Removal (Cunningham, Andrew)
March 18, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4. (Cunningham, Andrew)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4 from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2021CV001052 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4066900) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Andrew)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E Cunningham on behalf of NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew E. Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4. Attorney(s) appearing: Morgan I. Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeley v. National Collegiate Student Loan Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Blakeley
Represented By: Robert J Welcenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Student Loan Trust
Represented By: Michael Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust
Represented By: Michael Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Master Student Loan Trust I
Represented By: Dayle Marie Van Hoose
Represented By: Michael Alltmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCT, a de facto entity doing business as, or as a surviving entity of a de facto merger of entities including National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4
Represented By: Andrew E Cunningham
Represented By: Morgan I Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Eric G Pearson
Represented By: Thomas L Shriner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCT a de facto entity doing business as National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2006-4
Represented By: Andrew E Cunningham
Represented By: Morgan I Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?