Hunter v. Leggett et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hunter and Paul L Hunter
Defendant: Jeff Leggett, Faye Flancher, Jon Fredrickson, Heather Krause, Kristin Cafferty, Theodore Spypress, Scott Craig, Aaron Lamberty and State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2022cv00424
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress (Haggenjos, Micaela)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Haggenjos, Micaela)
May 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress. (Haggenjos, Micaela)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress (Hall, Samuel)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Micaela Haggenjos on behalf of Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress. Attorney(s) appearing: Micaela E. Haggenjos (Haggenjos, Micaela)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Scott Craig, Heather Krause, Aaron Lamberty, Jeff Leggett, Theodore Spypress. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jon Fredrickson - Waiver sent on 4/14/2022. (Malchow, Catherine)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Faye Flancher - Waiver sent on 4/14/2022. (Malchow, Catherine)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristin Cafferty - Waiver sent on 4/14/2022. (Malchow, Catherine)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Wisconsin - Waiver sent on 4/14/2022. (Malchow, Catherine)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Malchow on behalf of Kristin Cafferty, Faye Flancher, Jon Fredrickson, State of Wisconsin. Attorney(s) appearing: Catherine R. Malchow (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Malchow, Catherine)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Paul Hunter. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bx)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Paul Hunter. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. Jury (Filing Fee PAID; MK4689089154 $402.00) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Leggett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Leggett
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Flancher
Represented By: Catherine Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fredrickson
Represented By: Catherine Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Krause
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Cafferty
Represented By: Catherine Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Spypress
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Craig
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Lamberty
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Catherine Malchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?