Grant et al v. Walmart Claims Services Inc
Plaintiff: Leasa K Grant, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Defendant: Walmart Claims Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00428
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Allison M. Welch In Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Welch, Allison)
May 25, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss DHS by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Allison)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison M Welch on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Allison M. Welch (Welch, Allison)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/24/22 GRANTING re #11 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
May 24, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #12 Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word format. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute AttorneyAppoint Counsel by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Fons, Lynette) Modified on 5/25/2022 (jcl).
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Fons, Lynette)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peggy E Van Horn on behalf of Walmart Claims Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Peggy Van Horn (Van Horn, Peggy)
May 16, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference is scheduled for June 7, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and the telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. Please see #6 . (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
May 16, 2022 This case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin in error. This case has been returned to Judge Lynn Adelman. (kmr)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/13/22. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
May 13, 2022 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference scheduled for June 7, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. is removed from the court's calendar. (cc: all counsel) (kmr)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Leasa K Grant. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lococo, Michael)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Leasa K Grant. (Lococo, Michael)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/29/22.IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference is scheduled for June 7, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and the telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynette Fons on behalf of Walmart Claims Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Lynette K. Fons (Fons, Lynette)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Claims Services Inc.(Pastrana, Carlos)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pastrana, Carlos)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Claims Services Inc. (Pastrana, Carlos)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Claims Services Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2022CV00917 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4082537) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pastrana, Carlos)
April 6, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. Walmart Claims Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leasa K Grant
Represented By: Michael A Lococo
Represented By: Richard B Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Allison M Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Claims Services Inc
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Represented By: Lynette Fons
Represented By: Peggy E Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?