Stoller v. Kunes Chevrolet Buick GMC of Lake Geneva Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller, Leo D Stoller and Michael Stoller
Defendant: Kunes Chevrolet Buick GMC of Lake Geneva Inc, Gregg Kunes, Adam Zerbach, Nicole Pieper, Jon Mullen and Stephen Gasparek
Case Number: 2:2022cv00518
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Christopher Stoller re #15 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Filing of Brief)(rcm)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/31/2022. The court DENIESthe plaintiffs' motion requesting permission to file electronically, ECF No. #13 ; the plaintiffs' motion to remand, ECF No. #27 ; and the plaintiffs' motion to stay, ECF No. #26 . The court STRIKES the plaintiffs' motion to disqualify, ECF No. #24 . And the court grants in part and denies in part the defendants' motion to dismiss, ECF No. #15 . The clerk of court shall TERMINATE Leo and Michael Stoller as parties to this action. Christopher Stoller may have until June 23 to file a response to the defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. A reply brief may be filed on or before July 8, 2022. The clerk shall return to Christopher unfiled any submissions unrelated to the motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amb)
May 12, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to Kane County Circuit Court AND RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (kah)
May 12, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Copy of Motion to Disqualify)(kah) (Main Document 26 replaced on 5/13/2022) (kah).
May 11, 2022 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Trevino, Joseph)
May 10, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Removal by Christopher Stoller, Leo D Stoller. (kah)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/10/22. The court GRANTS the defendants' motion to extend, ECF No. #17 . The defendants may have until May 9, 2022, to file a response to the plaintiffs' complaint. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jh)
May 10, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiffs (Trevino, Joseph)
May 10, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of Answer on plaintiffs (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of Motion to Extend (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Joseph Trevino (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #15 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Trevino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Order to Allow Plaintiffs to Electronically File by Christopher Stoller, Leo D Stoller, Michael Stoller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Notice of Filing)(kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Stoller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christopher Stoller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Leo D Stoller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo D Stoller Pro Se. (kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stoller Pro Se. (kah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Stoller Pro Se. (kah)
May 6, 2022 Docket Annotation - updated address for plaintiffs to PO Box based on phone call from Leo Stoller (vkb)
May 6, 2022 DISREGARD; NOT MAILEDCopy of Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate #3 and consent/refusal form RESENT via U.S. Mail to Leo and Michael Stoller at PO Box address. (kah) Modified on 5/6/2022 (kah).
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Sent to Leo D Stoller and Michael Stoller Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate (jcl)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Corporate Disclosure on Plaintiffs)(Trevino, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff Christopher Stoller re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiffs Leo Stoller and Michael Stoller re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants on Plaintiffs of Notice of Removal (Trevino, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stephen Gasparek, Adam Zerbach, Gregg Kunes, Kunes Chevrolet Buick GMC of Lake Geneva, Nicole Pieper, Jon Mullen from Kane County, Case Number: 22-LA-000123 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4102534) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B Case of Stoller v. CMH Manufacturing)(Trevino, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoller v. Kunes Chevrolet Buick GMC of Lake Geneva Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo D Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kunes Chevrolet Buick GMC of Lake Geneva Inc
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Kunes
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Zerbach
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Pieper
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Mullen
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Gasparek
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?