Altenhofen et al v. National Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Josef C Altenhofen, Laurie Altenhofen and Western National Insurance Company
Defendant: National Indemnity Company, EMS Express LLC, Abubaker Z Ali, Yassine Y Hamid, EMR Logistics LLC and AA Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00759
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/25/2022. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 9/15/2022. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 24, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
August 23, 2022 Filing 16 STATEMENT by Abubaker Z Ali, EMS Express LLC regarding Additional Motion Papers. (Nelson, Mark)
August 23, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Abubaker Z Ali, EMS Express LLC. (Nelson, Mark)
August 23, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Abubaker Z Ali, EMS Express LLC.(Nelson, Mark)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Nelson on behalf of EMS Express LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark S. Nelson (Nelson, Mark)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Nelson on behalf of Abubaker Z Ali. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark S. Nelson (Nelson, Mark)
August 5, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Harding, Victor)
July 17, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Yassine Y Hamid.(Nelson, Mark)
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by National Indemnity Company.(Weiss, Monte)
July 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany L Van Roo on behalf of EMR Logistics LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Brittany L. Van Roo (Van Roo, Brittany)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by National Indemnity Company.(Weiss, Monte)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by EMR Logistics LLC.(Rice, Christine)
July 14, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by EMR Logistics LLC. (Rice, Christine)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M Rice on behalf of EMR Logistics LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Christine M. Rice (Rice, Christine)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Nelson on behalf of Yassine Y Hamid. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark S. Nelson (Nelson, Mark)
July 4, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by National Indemnity Company. (Weiss, Monte)
July 1, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Indemnity Company from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2022CV003097 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4151732) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service Exhibit B - Certificate of Service)(Weiss, Monte)
June 30, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altenhofen et al v. National Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef C Altenhofen
Represented By: Frank T Crivello, II
Represented By: Victor C Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Altenhofen
Represented By: Frank T Crivello, II
Represented By: Victor C Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Monte E Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS Express LLC
Represented By: Mark S Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abubaker Z Ali
Represented By: Mark S Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yassine Y Hamid
Represented By: Mark S Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMR Logistics LLC
Represented By: Brittany L Van Roo
Represented By: Christine M Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?