Carrero et al v. Tessendorf et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Carrero, Aubrey J. Carrero, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp and Aubrey J Carrero
Defendant: Mark E. Tessendorf, CH Hall Trucking Inc and AEGIS Security Insurance Company #33898
Case Number: 2:2022cv00771
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/1/22. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 12/16/2022. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 3/17/2023. Motions due by 4/21/2023. Discovery due by 11/10/2023. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2022. Court to adopt parties' proposed schedule. (kmr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 Joint Pretrial REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Stippel, Morgan)
July 28, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #10 filed by All Defendants. (Stippel, Morgan)
July 22, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #12 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp ; Document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge. This document must be RE-FILED,please use the form that is on our website www.wied.uscourts.gov; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Paider, Katelyn)
July 22, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp. (Paider, Katelyn)
July 22, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp. by Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp.(Paider, Katelyn)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn E Paider on behalf of Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Katelyn E. Paider (Paider, Katelyn)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on September 1, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(McFarlane, David)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip S Georges on behalf of Aubrey J Carrero, Jonathan Carrero. Attorney(s) appearing: Phillip S. Georges (Georges, Phillip)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (McFarlane, David)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McFarlane, David)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff Aubrey Carrero re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Affidavit of Service #1 for CH Hall Trucking, #4 Affidavit of Service #2 for CH Hall Trucking, #5 Affidavit of Service for AEGIS Security Ins. Co., #6 Affidavit of Service for Compcare Health Services Ins. Co., #7 Notice of Appearance for David E. McFarlane, #8 Notice of Appearance for Morgan K. Stippel, #9 Certificate of Service)(McFarlane, David)
July 7, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AEGIS Security Insurance Company #33898, Mark E. Tessendorf, CH Hall Trucking Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-CV-3147 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4155548)(McFarlane, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/6/2022) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrero et al v. Tessendorf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Carrero
Represented By: Phillip S Georges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey J. Carrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp
Represented By: Katelyn E Paider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey J Carrero
Represented By: Phillip S Georges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Tessendorf
Represented By: David E McFarlane
Represented By: Morgan K Stippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Hall Trucking Inc
Represented By: David E McFarlane
Represented By: Morgan K Stippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS Security Insurance Company #33898
Represented By: David E McFarlane
Represented By: Morgan K Stippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?