Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC v. New-Cell LLC
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC and Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC
Defendant: NEW-CELL, LLC d.b.a CELLCOM and New-Cell LLC doing business as Cellcom
Case Number: 2:2022cv00824
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 9/15/2022 re: #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant must now answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 3, 2022. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 14, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by New-Cell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Barreto, Francisco)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisco J Barreto on behalf of New-Cell LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Francisco J. Barreto (Barreto, Francisco)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by New-Cell LLC. (Koziol, Peter)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Koziol on behalf of New-Cell LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Peter A. Koziol, Esq. (Koziol, Peter)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 8/18/2022 re: #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant must now answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 16, 2022. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 17, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time by All Defendants. (Ersler, Donald)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Richards, Alison)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC. New-Cell LLC served on 7/28/2022. (Richards, Alison)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC (Richards, Alison)
July 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to New-Cell LLC. (vkb)
July 21, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin I Park on behalf of EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Irwin I. Park (Park, Irwin)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Powers Berten on behalf of EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David P. Berten (Berten, David)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC of Related Cases (Richards, Alison)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Richards, Alison)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against NEW-CELL, LLC d.b.a CELLCOM by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4165248) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Alison)
July 19, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC v. New-Cell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC
Represented By: David Powers Berten
Represented By: Irwin I Park
Represented By: Alison Aubry Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Alerts Innovations LLC
Represented By: David Powers Berten
Represented By: Irwin I Park
Represented By: Alison Aubry Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW-CELL, LLC d.b.a CELLCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New-Cell LLC doing business as Cellcom
Represented By: Donald J Ersler
Represented By: Francisco J Barreto
Represented By: Peter A Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?