Germantown Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company and Dimo's IV LLC
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation, Group Dekko Inc and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv01402
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Joint Initial Status Report by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Pegelow, Catlin)
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #4 filed by Group Dekko Inc. (Tobin, Matthew)
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on February 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
December 13, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Pegelow, Catlin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Group Dekko Inc. (Tobin, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Tobin, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 group dekko liberty ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Group Dekko Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Tobin, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Tobin on behalf of Group Dekko Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Tobin (Tobin, Matthew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Group Dekko Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
November 30, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (edr)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle W LeClere on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Kyle W. LeClere (LeClere, Kyle)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Meuler, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Group Dekko Inc. filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Meuler, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Meuler on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher M. Meuler (Meuler, Christopher)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Whirlpool Corporation. (Meuler, Christopher)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whirlpool Corporation from Fond du Lac County, Case Number: 22-CV-381 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4265343) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Catlin C Pegelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimo's IV LLC
Represented By: Catlin C Pegelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M Meuler
Represented By: Kyle W LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Dekko Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Tobin
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Tobin
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?