Koller v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Koller
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv01421
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Pawlak, Brian)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Robert Anthony Koller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Establishing Appeal Procedure: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 1/31/23;Plaintiff's brief due 3/12/23;Defendant's response due 4/21/23;Plaintiff's reply due 5/6/23. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to plaintiff) (jad) Modified on 12/6/2022 (jad).
December 2, 2022 SERVICE OF COMPLAINT - Pursuant to the #Eastern District of Wisconsin's Memorandum of Understanding, the Commissioner and U.S. Attorney's Office have been electronically served with the Social Security appeal via CM/ECF. NOTICE to Plaintiff - Service on the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the Commissioner requests otherwise. (asc)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 12/1/22 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Robert Anthony Koller. (amb)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Robert Anthony Koller ;Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Appeals Counsel Action (09.26.22))(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koller v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Koller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?