Heard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Fadera Heard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2023cv01162
Filed: September 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/8/2023. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 11/06/2023;Plaintiff's brief due 12/06/2023;Defendant's response due 1/05/2024;Plaintiff's reply due 1/19/2024. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fadera Heard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olinsky, Howard)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/5/2023 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Fadera Heard. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Fadera Heard. (Olinsky, Howard)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Fadera Heard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fadera Heard
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?