American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI as subrogee of Michelle Schreiber, Michelle Schreiber and American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Defendant: Gree USA Inc and MJC America Ltd
Case Number: 2:2023cv01354
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Piper-Kitchin, Julie)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/22/2023. Interim Settlement Report due by 7/1/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2024. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan Proposed Discovery Plan by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (Saber, Marisa)
November 9, 2023 NOTICE from the clerk to Gree USA Inc, and MJC America Ltd requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (rcm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by MJC America Ltd. (Piper-Kitchin, Julie)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gree USA Inc. (Piper-Kitchin, Julie)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 GREE USA, INC. AND MJC AMERICA, LTDS ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd.(Rhoades, Travis)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J Rhoades on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Travis J. Rhoades (Rhoades, Travis)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Piper-Kitchin on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Julie E. Piper-Kitchin (Piper-Kitchin, Julie)
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. MJC America Ltd served on 10/19/2023. (Saber, Marisa)
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. Gree USA Inc served on 10/20/2023. (Saber, Marisa)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Saber, Marisa)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/13/2023. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
October 13, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI as subrogee of Michelle Schreiber. (Saber, Marisa)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI as subrogee of Michelle Schreiber. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4516404) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gree Recall, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Gree USA Inc, #4 Summons MJC America Ltd)(Saber, Marisa)
October 12, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI as subrogee of Michelle Schreiber
Represented By: Marisa Lynn Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Represented By: Marisa Lynn Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Represented By: Julie Piper-Kitchin
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd
Represented By: Julie Piper-Kitchin
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?