Shan v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: XIAOFEI SHAN
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M Jaddou and Merrick B Garland
Case Number: 2:2023cv01382
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/11/2023. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation of dismissal, ECF No. #15 , be and the same is hereby ADOPTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action be and the same is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Merrick B Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Carter, Michael)
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Michael)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/6/2023. #14 Defendants' unopposed motion to extend their time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint will be due on or before 12/15/2023. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
November 8, 2023 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William Duffin be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. (rcm)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/30/2023. #13 Defendants' unopposed motion to extend their time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' complaint will be due on or before 12/7/2023. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Michael)
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carter, Michael)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Carter on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael A. Carter (Carter, Michael)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER to Stephen DeGenaro regarding Admission and ECF registration (sent via USPS) (jcl)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER to Sadaf F Ahmed regarding Admission and ECF registration (jcl)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-02239. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants (DeGenaro, Stephen) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer by 10/16/2023. (nbn) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendants Consent #7 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED; 2) The case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin; and 3) Defendants shall respond to the Complaint within 21 days after docketing in the transferee district. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/6/2023. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 8/14/2023; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/14/2023 (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/17/2023. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2023. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsl) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10250417) filed by XIAOFEI SHAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, #4 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATT. GENERAL, #5 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, #6 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR. M. JADDOU, #7 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from dcd on 10/17/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shan v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIAOFEI SHAN
Represented By: Sadaf F. Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Represented By: Michael A Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Represented By: Michael A Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Represented By: Michael A Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?