Weich v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diann Weich
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc and Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01566
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Charles Roberts on behalf of Diann Weich. Attorney(s) appearing: Justin C. Roberts (Roberts, Justin)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/4/2024. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2024. Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2024, Discovery due by 8/4/2025, Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 11/4/2024, Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 2/4/2025, Motions due by 4/4/2025, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach, and Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #Zoom 010424) (jmk)
December 29, 2023 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Discovery Plan by All Defendants. (Kelber, Tamar)
December 28, 2023 Filing 18 Defendants' REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Kelber, Tamar)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: William Francis Northrip (Northrip, William)
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Roznowski, Adam)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R Roznowski on behalf of Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam R. Roznowski (Roznowski, Adam)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Kelber, Tamar)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar B Kelber on behalf of Sanofi Aventis US LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Tamar B. Kelber (Kelber, Tamar)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER from the Court to Attorney Roberts regarding ECF registration. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Attorney Roberts) (Griesbach, William)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 9:40 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/28/2023. The parties shall call the court's Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252, use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308, press # to bypass Participant ID, and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerk's Office at 920-455-7381. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Attorney Roberts) (kwf)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER to Jousef M Shkoukani regarding ECF registration and Admission (sent via USPS) (jcl)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER to Justin Charles Roberts regarding ECF registration and Admission( sent via USPS) (jcl)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10500. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (vkb)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Diann Weich. **See Rec. Doc 12434 filed in master case 16-md-2740** (am) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7214314) filed by Diann Weich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Justin Charles Roberts added to party Diann Weich(pty:pla).(Roberts, Justin) [Transferred from laed on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weich v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Adam R Roznowski
Represented By: Tamar B Kelber
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Adam R Roznowski
Represented By: Tamar B Kelber
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Adam R Roznowski
Represented By: Tamar B Kelber
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diann Weich
Represented By: Justin Charles Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?