Yauch v. Schuette et al
Plaintiff: Devin R Yauch
Defendant: RN Schuette, Michelle and JA LaCrosse
Case Number: 2:2024cv00285
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/1/2024. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the sum of $0.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. By 5/1/2024, plaintiff to NOTIFY the Court if he does not wish to proceed with this action to avoid incurring a potential "strike." (cc: all counsel, via mail to Devin R Yauch at Manitowac County Jail)(jm)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Devin R Yauch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(bx)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Devin R Yauch. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bx)
March 5, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Devin R Yauch re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ams)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Devin R Yauch. (ams)
March 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Devin R Yauch. (ams)
March 4, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Devin R Yauch. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yauch v. Schuette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin R Yauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Schuette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA LaCrosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?