Doe v. Elkhorn Area School District et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Elkhorn Area School District, Jason Tadlock and Ryan McBurney
Case Number: 2:2024cv00354
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/2/2024: GRANTING #29 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms as modified for protected information disclosed during this matter. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
May 1, 2024 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wardenski, Joseph) Modified on 5/2/2024 (mew).
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/24/2024. #27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief is GRANTED. #21 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule is DENIED. Defendants' response to #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 6/3/2024; Plaintiff may REPLY within 14 days of Defendants' response. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
April 23, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Brief)(Wardenski, Joseph)
April 22, 2024 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Ronald S Stadler (Attachments: #1 EX A 3-26-24 email)(Stadler, Ronald)
April 22, 2024 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Stadler, Ronald)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/22/2024: Interim Settlement Report due by 9/10/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2024. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
April 19, 2024 Filing 23 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - ESI Guidelines)(Wardenski, Joseph)
April 18, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE by Jane Doe of Meet and Confer Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 18, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 16, 2024 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Stadler, Ronald)
April 16, 2024 NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (rcm)
April 15, 2024 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Stadler, Ronald)
April 12, 2024 Filing 18 ATTACHMENTS Text of Proposed Order by Jane Doe re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE by Jane Doe of Meet and Confer Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support filed by Jane Doe re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Doe (redacted), #2 Declaration of Joseph Wardenski, #3 Ex. 1 to Wardenski Decl. - WASB Legal Update, #4 Ex. 2 to Wardenski Decl. - EASD Gender Support Protocols (Sept. 2021), #5 Ex. 3 to Wardenski Decl. - EASD Procedures for Nondiscrimination (Apr. 2021), #6 Ex. 4 to Wardenski Decl. - Boardman Clark Title IX Training, #7 Ex. 5 to Wardenski Decl. - In-Service Training, #8 Ex. 6 to Wardenski Decl. - EASD Gender Support Protocols (Oct. 2023), #9 Ex. 7 to Wardenski Decl. - Jane Doe Gender Support Plan (redacted), #10 Ex. 8 to Wardenski Decl. - Jane Doe Amended Gender Support Plan (redacted), #11 Ex. 9 to Wardenski Decl. - Johnson X Post (6-22-2023), #12 Ex. 10 to Wardenski Decl. - School Board Meeting Minutes (7-17-2023), #13 Ex. 11 to Wardenski Decl. - PDE Website Post, #14 Ex. 12 to Wardenski Decl. - Johnson X Post (7-18-2023), #15 Ex. 13 to Wardenski Decl. - Johnson X Post with Comment (7-18-2023), #16 Ex. 14 to Wardenski Decl. - Dan O'Donnell Show, #17 Ex. 15 to Wardenski Decl. - School Board Meeting Agenda (7-24-2023), #18 Ex. 16 to Wardenski Decl. - Board Meeting Presentation, #19 Ex. 17 to Wardenski Decl. - Board Meeting Minutes (7-24-2023), #20 Ex. 18 to Wardenski Decl. - Board Meeting Agenda (8-14-2023), #21 Ex. 19 to Wardenski Decl. - Board Meeting Minutes (8-14-2023), #22 Ex. 20 to Wardenski Decl. - Emails (redacted), #23 Ex. 21 to Wardenski Decl. - Sixth Grade Progress Report (redacted), #24 Ex. 22 to Wardenski Decl. - Seventh Grade Class Grades (redacted), #25 Ex. 23 to Wardenski Decl. - Therapist Letter (redacted), #26 Ex. 24 to Wardenski Decl. - Treatment Plan (redacted), #27 Declaration of John Doe (unredacted), #28 Ex. 7 to Wardenski Decl. - Jane Doe Gender Support Plan (unredacted), #29 Ex. 8 to Wardenski Decl. - Jane Doe Amended Gender Support Plan (unredacted), #30 Ex. 20 to Wardenski Decl. - Emails (unredacted), #31 Ex. 21 to Wardenski Decl. - Sixth Grade Progress Report (unredacted), #32 Ex. 22 to Wardenski Decl. - Seventh Grade Class Grades (unredacted), #33 Ex. 23 to Wardenski Decl. - Therapist Letter (unredacted), #34 Ex. 24 to Wardenski Decl. - Treatment Plan (unredacted))This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Wardenski, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE by Jane Doe of Meet and Confer Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Seal Documents (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wardenski, Joseph)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/9/2024. #9 Plaintiff's unopposed motion to continue using pseudonyms is GRANTED. In light of Defendants' non-opposition, Plaintiff Jane Doe, as well as her parents and next friends John Doe and Jill Doe, are PERMITTED to continue using pseudonyms in this action. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
April 5, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Ryan McBurney served on 4/2/2024. (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 5, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Jason Tadlock served on 3/25/2024. (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Elkhorn Area School District served on 3/25/2024. (Wardenski, Joseph)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Proceed Using Pseudonyms by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wardenski, Joseph)
April 5, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stadler, Ronald)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Sacks on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan E. Sacks (Sacks, Jonathan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Stadler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ronald S. Stadler (Stadler, Ronald)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/22/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jane Doe. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wardenski, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jane Doe. This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Wardenski, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jane Doe. (Wardenski, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge William Duffin to be filed within 21 days. The consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)
March 22, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jane Doe. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4638074) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Elkhorn Area School District, #3 Summons to Jason Tadlock, #4 Summons to Ryan McBurney)(Wardenski, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Elkhorn Area School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Robert Theine Pledl
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Davis Davila
Represented By: Joseph J Wardenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elkhorn Area School District
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Tadlock
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McBurney
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?