Nash v. Milwaukee County et al
Plaintiff: Monica D Nash
Defendant: Milwaukee County Sheriff, Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office, Milwaukee County, Shawn Bacich, Denita Ball, Theodore Chisholm, Brent Smoot, Earnell Lucas, Detective Mitchell Gottschalk and Ron Lagosh
Case Number: 2:2024cv00442
Filed: April 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/6/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised pretrial procedures for civil cases. All parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Attachments) (gap)
June 6, 2024 Filing 12 TRANSMIT #8 Order, #6 Amended Complaint, Notice, Waiver, and Consent to US Marshal for service upon Shawn Bacich, Denita Ball, Theodore Chisholm, Brent Smoot, Earnell Lucas, Mitchell Gottschalk, Ron Lagosh, and Milwaukee County. (mew)
June 5, 2024 Filing 11 LETTER by Monica D Nash REQUESTING E-Filing permission for all future court documents and correspondence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mlm)
June 5, 2024 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
June 5, 2024 Case no longer referred to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (mlm)
June 3, 2024 Filing 10 (continued see ECF No. #8 ) RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/3/2024. Recommended defendant Milwaukee County be dismissed as a defendant. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
June 3, 2024 Filing 9 DISREGARD ENTRY - SEE DOCKET NO. 10 (continued see ECF No. #8 ) RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/3/2024. Recommended defendant Milwaukee County be dismissed as a defendant. Case referred to Judge J P Stadtmueller (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm) Modified on 6/5/2024 (mlm).
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/3/2024. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (continued below).... (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/7/2024. #5 Magistrate Judge William E Duffin's Report and Recommendation is MOOTED by the filing of #6 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Case RETURNED to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for further proceedings. Case no longer referred to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Monica D Nash)(jm)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shawn Bacich, Denita Ball, Theodore Chisholm, Brent Smoot, Earnell Lucas, Mitchell Gottschalk, Ron Lagosh and Milwaukee County filed by Monica D Nash.(lz)
April 25, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Judge J P Stadtmueller for order. (lz)
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 ...(continued from ECF No 4-identital document) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/24/2024 re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Monica D Nash RECOMMENDING that the complaint be dismissed. Nash may file an amended complaint within 14 days. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party with amended complaint form)(lz)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/24/2024 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff with amended complaint form)(lz)
April 12, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Monica D Nash. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lz)
April 12, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Monica D Nash. (lz)
April 12, 2024 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Milwaukee County Sheriff, Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office and Milwaukee County filed by Monica D Nash. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Jury Demand. (lz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Milwaukee County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica D Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Bacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denita Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnell Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Mitchell Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Lagosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?