Killebrew v. Vogel et al
Plaintiff: Shondell Killebrew
Defendant: Heather Riehle Vogel and Marqueleana McMurtry
Case Number: 2:2024cv00514
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marqueleana McMurtry and Heather Riehle Vogel filed by Shondell Killebrew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F (bookmarked))(mew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2024: #2 Envelope) (mew).
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/4/2024. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is GRANTED. By 7/9/2024, Plaintiff to FILE an amended complaint; failure to timely do so will result in dismissal of this action. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Shondell Killebrew with prisoner amended complaint form and pro se/prisoner guides)(jm)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shondell Killebrew. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mew)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Shondell Killebrew re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (rcm)
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Shondell Killebrew. (rcm)
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Shondell Killebrew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(rcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killebrew v. Vogel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shondell Killebrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Riehle Vogel
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marqueleana McMurtry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?