Kelley v. Boneparth et al
Plaintiff: David Kelley
Defendant: Wendy Arlin, Michael J. Bender, Kohl's Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Adrianne Shapira, Margaret L Jenkins, Peter Boneparth, Christine Day, Thomas A Kingsbury, Yael Cosset, Adolfo Villagomez, John E Schlifske, H Charles Floyd and Jonas Prising
Case Number: 2:2024cv00604
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING STAY OF ACTION signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/24/2024. Court GRANTS #6 Stipulation Regarding Stay of Action. Details in order. (cc: all counsel)(amh)
June 21, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Stay of Action by Wendy Arlin, Michael J. Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H. Charles Floyd, Margaret L Jenkins, Thomas A Kingsbury, Kohl's Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira, Adolfo Villagomez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Colleen)
June 21, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wendy Arlin, Michael J. Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H. Charles Floyd, Margaret L Jenkins, Thomas A Kingsbury, Kohl's Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira, Adolfo Villagomez. (Smith, Colleen)
June 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D Johnson on behalf of Wendy Arlin, Michael J. Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H. Charles Floyd, Margaret L Jenkins, Thomas A Kingsbury, Kohl's Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira, Adolfo Villagomez. Attorney(s) appearing: Michele D. Johnson (Johnson, Michele)
June 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Smith on behalf of Wendy Arlin, Michael J. Bender, Peter Boneparth, Yael Cosset, Christine Day, H. Charles Floyd, Margaret L Jenkins, Thomas A Kingsbury, Kohl's Corporation, Robbin Mitchell, Jonas Prising, John E Schlifske, Adrianne Shapira, Adolfo Villagomez. Attorney(s) appearing: Colleen C. Smith (Smith, Colleen)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by David Kelley. (Ficaro, James)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; David Kelley against All Defendants . ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4679152) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Demand, #3 Exhibit B - Response, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence)(Ficaro, James) Modified on 5/16/2024 (mlm).
May 16, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Boneparth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Arlin
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbin Mitchell
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianne Shapira
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret L Jenkins
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Boneparth
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Day
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Kingsbury
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yael Cosset
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Villagomez
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E Schlifske
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Charles Floyd
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas Prising
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Colleen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kelley
Represented By: John J Gross
Represented By: James M Ficaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?