MPC et al v. Racine County et al
Plaintiff: CMC and MPC
Defendant: Doran Jose Kemp, II, Helping Hands on 75th Street LLC, Hope Otto, My Choice Wisconsin Inc, GHI Insurance Company, Alex Mayfield, MNO Insurance Company, Michael Mixon, Jalee Banach, ABC Insurance Company, JKL Insurance Company, Racine County, Michele Kennon, Lekeisha M Johnson, Doran J Kemp, Jr, DEF Insurance Company, Danny C Webb, Roger L Hughley and Lori Knapp Richland Inc
Case Number: 2:2024cv00630
Filed: May 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2024 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lori Knapp Richland Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Scipior, Vincent)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 6/28/2024 re: #17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court approves the stipulation. Defendant My Choice Wisconsin, Inc. must now respond to the complaint on or before July 29, 2024. (cc:all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
June 27, 2024 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by My Choice Wisconsin Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seese, Lee)
June 27, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee M Seese on behalf of My Choice Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Lee M. Seese (Seese, Lee)
June 27, 2024 Filing 15 LETTER from the clerk to Alex Mayfield re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ams)
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alex Mayfield.(ams)
June 20, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jalee Banach - Waiver sent on 6/17/2024. (Hall, Samuel)
June 20, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hope Otto - Waiver sent on 6/17/2024. (Hall, Samuel)
June 20, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Racine County - Waiver sent on 6/17/2024. (Hall, Samuel)
June 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Micaela Haggenjos on behalf of Jalee Banach, Hope Otto, Racine County. Attorney(s) appearing: Micaela E. Haggenjos (Haggenjos, Micaela)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara C Mills on behalf of Jalee Banach, Hope Otto, Racine County. Attorney(s) appearing: Sara C. Mills (Mills, Sara)
June 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Jalee Banach, Hope Otto, Racine County. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
June 18, 2024 NOTICE from the clerk to Lori Knapp Richland Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (ams)
June 17, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Helping Hands on 75th Street LLC served on 5/31/2024. (Cade, Nathaniel)
June 17, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lori Knapp Richland Inc. (Scipior, Vincent)
June 17, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lori Knapp Richland Inc.(Scipior, Vincent)
June 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Scipior on behalf of Lori Knapp Richland Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Vincent J. Scipior (Scipior, Vincent)
May 22, 2024 Summons Issued as to Jalee Banach, Helping Hands on 75th Street LLC, Roger L Hughley, Lekeisha M Johnson, Doran Jose Kemp, II, Michele Kennon, Lori Knapp Richland Inc, Alex Mayfield, Michael Mixon, My Choice Wisconsin Inc, Hope Otto, Racine County, and Danny C Webb. (ams)
May 22, 2024 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified to remove punctuation - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website.The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. The attached summons does not include the Plaintiffs' attorney's address. Please resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (ams) Modified on 5/22/2024 (ams).
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Banach, #2 Summons Summons - Otto, #3 Summons Summons - My Choice, #4 Summons Summons - Kennon, #5 Summons Summons - Helping Hands, #6 Summons Summons - Kemp, #7 Summons Summons - Mayfield, #8 Summons Summons - Johnson, #9 Summons Summons - Webb, #10 Summons Summons - Hughley, #11 Summons Summons - Knapp, #12 Summons Summons - Mixon)(Cade, Nathaniel) Modified on 5/22/2024 (ams).
May 21, 2024 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by CMC, MPC. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4682359) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel) Modified on 5/22/2024 (ams).
May 21, 2024 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPC et al v. Racine County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doran Jose Kemp, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helping Hands on 75th Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Otto
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Choice Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Lee M Seese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalee Banach
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine County
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Kennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lekeisha M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doran J Kemp, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny C Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L Hughley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Knapp Richland Inc
Represented By: Vincent James Scipior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMC
Represented By: Madison M Bedder
Represented By: Antonique C Williams
Represented By: Annalisa Pusick
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPC
Represented By: Madison M Bedder
Represented By: Antonique C Williams
Represented By: Annalisa Pusick
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?