Pacult et al v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Jason Pacult, Melissa Bargfrede, JR Toledo, Neil Thompson, Daniel Bieurance and Usa Ex Rel
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00542
Filed: September 16, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER that the parties have until January 30, 2012 to submit additionalargument solely on the question whether the dismissal of the Indiana state court action should be construed as a dismissal by notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/19/2012. (voc)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER directing the relators to submit to the court copies of the documents relevant to this courts inquiry, including the docket sheet for the case (if available), any answer or other response, any summary judgment motion and any court order of dismissal. Submissions due by is December 16, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/1/2011. (voc)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Walgreen Co. dismissing the case without prejudice. (SLC / PAO) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/22/2011. (voc)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re 89 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Relator plaintiffs and intervenor plaintiffs should file a letter or brief by 7/22/2011. Defendant Walgreen must file any objection to dismissal without prejudice by 7/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/14/2011. (voc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacult et al v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Pacult
Represented By: Brian Wojtalewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bargfrede
Represented By: Brian Wojtalewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JR Toledo
Represented By: Brian Wojtalewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Thompson
Represented By: Brian Wojtalewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bieurance
Represented By: Brian Wojtalewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Usa Ex Rel
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?