Gillis v. Raemisch et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Gillis, Giovanni Harris, Jeremiah Young, Luis Ramirez, Hakim Naseer and Sylvester Pryor
Defendant: Rick Raemisch, G. Grams, J. Nickles, Ricky, Captain Ashworth, Neumier, Boodry, M. Marshall, Lieutenant Keller, Alsum, Salter, CAPTAIN RADTKE, Lipinski, Walker, Vilwock, Morrison, CAPTAIN JOHNSON, Capt. Trattles, Lind, Brett Sutton, M. Leiser and John Does 1- 5
Case Number: 3:2009cv00245
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. ( PAO). (jef),(ps)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting defendant's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment for plaintiff's failure to exhaust his claims that guards threw away a set of plaintiff's Qur'an and religious books and tore the back off another Qur'an; denying pl aintiff's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment and defendant's 112 motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's claim that defendant Ashworth filed a false conduct report against him and denying plaintiff's 64 motion for summary jud gment on plaintiff's claim that defendant Grams ignored his complaints; denying plaintiff's 151 and 170 Motions for Reconsideration; granting plaintiff's 161 , 171 and 172 Motions for Clarification; and denying plaintiff's 174 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendants will have until 10/18/2010 to submit the identities of the John Doe defendants to plaintiff and the court. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/4/2010. (jef),(ps)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying plaintiff's 173 Motion to have discovery materials photographed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/7/2010. (jef),(ps)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 147 Motion for Clarification; denying 148 Letter appealing Magistrate's ruling; granting 159 Motion to pay full $290 amount immediately; denying 160 Letter from plaintiff to Judge Crabb requesting review of Magistrate Judge Crocker's decisions. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/17/2010. (jef),(ps)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Clarification; denying 163 Motion for Clarification; denying 164 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/16/2010. (jef),(ps)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying as moot 49 Motion to Stay ; denying 53 Motion for reconsideration ; denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 128 Motion for order directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's proposed findings of fact; granting 112 motion for summary judgment as to due process claim against defendant Lane and claim that defendant Raemisch ignored complaints. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/28/2010. (eds),(ps)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that plaintiff pay defendants $290 for reasonable expenses incurred in responding to plaintiff's motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/27/2010. (eds),(ps)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 138 Motion to to pursue an appeal in the Seventh Circuit Court ; denying 139 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 140 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/14/2010. (eds),(ps)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying 130 Motion to stop defendants' attorney from providing personal information without written consent; denying 131 Motion for Clarification ; denying 132 Motion to Compel. Defendants awarded reasonable expenses incurred in responding to plaintiff's motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/8/2010. (eds),(ps)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 106 Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification ; denying 107 Motion for Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/21/2010. (eds),(ps)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 67 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/11/10. (elc),(ps)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 92 Motion for reconsideration and clarification; denying 93 Request for leave to file interlocutory appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/8/2010. (eds),(ps)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 84 Motion to have inspector's report submitted to the court at the time it is submitted to defendants' counsel and the report shall be filed under seal; entering 75 B proposed protective order; denying as moot 48 and 50 Motions; granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time ( Defendants' Brief in Opposition due 6/24/2010. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 7/6/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/3/2010. (eds),(ps)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying as moot 68 Motion to allow expert witness to inspect DS1 unit ; granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/9/2010 for defendants to answer plaintiff's motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/10. (elc),(ps)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; granting 29 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 33 Motion for Clarification ; denying 34 Motion for inspection of DSI - Segregation Unit ; denying 35 Motion for Entry of Default ; denying 45 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/26/2010. (eds),(ps)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration ; plaintiffs Young, Naseer and Pryor are dismissed from the case. 12 Proposed Amended Complaint is dismissed. Second amended complaint due by 9/24/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/2/09. (elc),(ps)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order dismissing complaint. Proposed amended complaint due 7/7/09 along with filing fee or six-month trust fund account statement for all plaintiffs except Gillis. Plaintiffs given opportunity to opt out of group lawsuit by 7/7/2009 without being charged a filing fee. Plaintiff Ramirez dismissed. 9 Motion for preliminary injunction denied. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/16/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakim Naseer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Grams
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nickles
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Ashworth
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neumier
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boodry
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Marshall
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Keller
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alsum
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salter
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN RADTKE
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipinski
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilwock
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN JOHNSON
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Trattles
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lind
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Sutton
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Leiser
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1- 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?