Fertel-Rust, Mary v. UWM Golda Meir Library et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust
Defendant: UWM Golda Meir Library, Eva Barlzak, Security Guard Firm, White Male Unnamed, UWM Police Dept., Jamie Castro, Herrara, Schlimgen, Central Main Library, Paula Kiel, Crystal Sura, Michael Weber, Chris (Christine) Arkenburg, Witherspoon, Male Running Cafe in the Bookcellar, Wisconsin Public State Law Library, Jane, Her Boss, Shirley Abrahamson, State Law Library, City of Milwaukee Legislature Reference Bureau Library, 2 White Female Reference Librarians, Their Boss, The Common Council of the City of Milwaukee and Alissa Miss or Mrs. Petersson
Case Number: 3:2011cv00430
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2011 Filing 10 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust. (elc),(ps)
July 8, 2011 Filing 9 Supplement to 1 Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (jas),(ps)
July 7, 2011 Filing 8 Supplement to 1 Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (jas),(ps)
July 7, 2011 Filing 7 Supplement to 1 Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (jas),(ps)
July 6, 2011 Filing 6 Exhibit A - Friends of the Libraries Magazine to 1 Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (jas),(ps) Cover and back page only as exhibit is too voluminous.
June 22, 2011 Filing 5 Supplement to 1 Complaint filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copy of letter with observation notes, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter from City of Wauwatosa Fire Dept., # 3 Exhibit C - Newspaper article) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2011: # 7 Envelope) (jef).
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/17/2011. (jef),(ps)
June 17, 2011 Filing 3 Supplement to (1 in 3:11-cv-00211-wmc) Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust, (1 in 3:11-cv-00431-wmc) Complaint,, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust, (1 in 3:11-cv-00432-wmc) Complaint filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust, (1 in 3:11-cv-00317-wmc) Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust, (1 in 3:11-cv-00274-wmc) Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust, (1 in 3:11-cv-00430-wmc) Complaint, filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust (jas),(ps)
June 14, 2011 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust. (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants filed by Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: # 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Letter from UWM, posted hours, user rights and responsibilities, # 3 Exhibit B - Notes, # 4 Exhibit C - Cover page of the ATT Yellow Pages) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fertel-Rust, Mary v. UWM Golda Meir Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. Koegel Fertel-Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UWM Golda Meir Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Barlzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Guard Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Male Unnamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UWM Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlimgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Main Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Sura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris (Christine) Arkenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Male Running Cafe in the Bookcellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Public State Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Her Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milwaukee Legislature Reference Bureau Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 White Female Reference Librarians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Their Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Common Council of the City of Milwaukee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alissa Miss or Mrs. Petersson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?