December 5, 2014 |
Filing
81
ORDER that the August 12, 2013 order is VACATED with respect to the decision to dismiss plaintiffs Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala's and Spencer Brown's claim under the free exercise clause that defendant Todd Overbo refused plaintiffs' request to receive Ramadan accommodations in 2012. That claim will proceed to trial. The parties may have until January 3, 2015, to inform the court whether they wish to proceed with a court trial or a jury trial and to provide any authority that might be relevant to the decision. Plaintiff Ajala's motion for reconsideration, dkt. # 79 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/5/2014. (jef),(ps)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
74
ORDER that defendants Anthony Broadbent, Todd Overbo, Charles Cole, Tim Haines, Peter Huibregtse, Cathy Jess, Rick Raemish and Kelly West's 37 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala (formerly known as Dennis Jones-El) and Spencer Brown's 47 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Plaintiffs may have until November 28, 2014, to file supplemental materials on the question whether they should be permitted to proceed with their claim that defendant Ov erbo violated the free exercise clause by refusing to accept their 2012 requests for Ramadan accommodations. If plaintiffs do not respond by that date, I will direct the clerk of court to enter judgment in favor of defendants on all of plaintiffs' claims. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/04/2014. (nln),(ps)
|
September 4, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER denying plaintiffs' 52 motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/4/2014. (jef),(ps)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying plaintiffs' 54 request to stay briefing on the damages issue; and granting plaintiffs' 54 Motion for Extension of Time. The stay on briefing the parties' summary judgment motions is LIFTED. Opposition materials due 8/28/2014. Reply materials due 9/8/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/21/2014. (jef),(ps) Modified text on 8/21/2014 (jef).
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Spencer Brown's complaint is DISMISSED as to his claim that defendants denied his request in 2012 for an Eid-ul-Fitr meal, in violation of the Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act, the free exercise clause, the establishment clause and the equal protection clause. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/29/2014. (jef),(ps)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER that this case is SEVERED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 20, Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and the court's inherent authority into cases 13-cv-544-bbc, 13-cv-545-bbc and 13-cv-546-bbc. The following defendants are DISMISSED from case no. 13-cv-18 4-bbc: Smith, Hamblin, Casperson and Boughton. I will screen case no. 13-cv-184-bbc in a separate order. Plaintiff Ajala is directed to make three additional initial partial payments in the amount of $19.59 for each new case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/12/2013. (jef),(ps)
|
May 3, 2013 |
Filing
13
ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $217.75 assessed as to plaintiff Spencer Brown. (Brown's Initial partial filing fee due 5/24/2013.) Plaintiff Mustafa-El K.A. Ajala's Motion for order directing WSPF business office to use release account funds to pay initial partial filing fee and for an extension of time is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/3/2013. (jef),(ps)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
4
ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Ajala's $19.59 initial partial filing fee, Brown's trust fund account statement and plaintiffs' response regarding prosecuting this case jointly order due 4/17/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
|