Collins Bey, Robert v. Haines, Tim et al

Plaintiff: Robert L. Collins Bey
Defendant: Tim Haines, Peter Huibregtse, Michael Meisner, Tony Ashworth, Sara Mason, Mary Miller, Cindy Sawinski, Karen Anderson, Cynthia M. Thorpe, Steven, James Thorpe, James Wommack, William Giswold and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2013cv00618
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Appoint Expert or Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; granting 97 Motion for Ruling denying 97 motion to strike defendant Mary Miller's declaration and for sanctions against defendants. Defendants may have unti l February 19, 2016, to show cause why this court should not order the state to provide plaintiff with postage and writing materials. The parties' motions to amend the scheduling order, Dkt. 78 & 105 , are GRANTED. The existing schedule is STRICKEN. Plaintiff may have until April 13, 2016, to submit his materials in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants have until April 25, 2016, to file their reply. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/5/2016. (jef),(ps)
August 27, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting plaintiff's 55 amended complaint at the operative pleading in this case. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed on an Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Gary Boughton for failing to respond to his complaint about the lack of adequate dental treatment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/27/2015. (jef),(ps)
November 21, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the clerk of court is directed to set a telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen Crocker to set the schedule for the remainder of the proceedings in this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/21/2014. (nln),(ps)
September 9, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff Robert L. Collins Bey's 40 motion to compel discovery and for discovery sanctions. Plaintiff's 47 motion for the court's assistance in recruiting counsel is GRANTED. Further proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the court locating counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/09/2014. (nln),(ps)
April 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Plaintiff's supporting materials are due May 12, 2014. Defendants mayhave until May 26, 2014 to file their opposition. The caption is amended to remove the John Doe defendants and add Tom Boston. Defendant Gary Boughton is added to the case as a defendant for purposes of plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/28/2014. (elc),(ps)
March 21, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; denying 21 Motion for DOC staff to sign a document certifying that his dental records are complete, denying defendants' 22 motion to compel plaintiff to review his dental records and sign a medical release authorization form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/21/2014. (jef),(ps)
November 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties treat Dr. Steve and Dr. John Doe as John Doe defendants until plaintiff can ascertain their true identities in accordance with a schedule to be set by the United States Magistrate Judge at the preliminary pretrial conference to be held in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/12/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 6, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 9/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/6/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins Bey, Robert v. Haines, Tim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Collins Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Haines
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Huibregtse
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meisner
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ashworth
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Mason
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Miller
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Sawinski
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Anderson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia M. Thorpe
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thorpe
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wommack
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Giswold
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?