Geboy, Mark v. Oneida County et al
Plaintiff: Network Health Plan, Mark M. Geboy and State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Defendant: Oneida County Sheriff's Office, Timothy Johnson, Michael Baran, Stetson Grant, Christopher Coniglio and Oneida County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00574
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Brief in Opposition due 10/3/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Garza, Jesus)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Jesus Gabriel Garza for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Garza, Jesus)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER by Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. (Luther, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Network Health Plan and State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (jls)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark M. Geboy, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Network Health Plan, #2 Summons - State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services) (Korb, Todd) Modified on 8/15/2019. (lak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Christopher Coniglio served on 7/28/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Korb, Todd)
August 8, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 8/21/2019. (lak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 Affidavit of Jennifer M. Luther filed by Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office re: #17 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 15CF114 CCAP Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Incident Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - 18CF240 CCAP Report) (Luther, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 Brief in Support of #17 Motion to Dismiss Counts I-IV by Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. (Luther, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS Counts I-IV by Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. Brief in Opposition due 8/28/2019. Brief in Reply due 9/9/2019. (Luther, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Luther for Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. (Luther, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendants Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. (Lubinsky, Lori)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Michael Baran served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Korb, Todd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Oneida County served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Korb, Todd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Oneida County Sheriff's Office served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Korb, Todd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Stetson Grant served on 7/21/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Korb, Todd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Timothy Johnson served on 7/21/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Michael Baran, Christopher Coniglio, Stetson Grant, Timothy Johnson, Oneida County, Oneida County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons Oneida County Sheriff's Office, #2 Summons Stetson Grant, #3 Summons Christopher Coniglio, #4 Summons Timothy Johnson, #5 Summons Michael Baran) (voc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
July 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mark M. Geboy. (Korb, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2501084.), filed by Mark M. Geboy, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Korb, Todd) Modified on 7/15/2019: Updated party roles. Removed address information for all parties. Case number missing from complaint. Case number on summonses is listed as 360. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geboy, Mark v. Oneida County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baran
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stetson Grant
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Coniglio
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida County
Represented By: Jennifer M. Luther
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Network Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M. Geboy
Represented By: Todd Richard Korb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?