Wilson, Grashan v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grashan Wilson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation and Army & Air Force Exchange Service
Case Number: 3:2022cv00207
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 26 Declaration of Sandra Ostler filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation re: #24 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration Acknowledging Electronic Signature Process) (Kruse, Natalia)
June 10, 2022 Filing 25 Brief in Support of #24 Motion to Compel by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (Kruse, Natalia)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 Motion to Compel by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 6/17/2022. (Kruse, Natalia)
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kruse, Natalia)
June 10, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa M. Lawless for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Lawless, Lisa)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Fogarty, Clare)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Credit Acceptance Corporation answer due 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/2/2022. (voc)
June 2, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kruse, Natalia)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Credit Acceptance Corporation answer due 6/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/27/2022. (voc)
May 26, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kruse, Natalia)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Experian Information Solutions Inc. answer due 6/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/25/2022. (jls)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fogarty, Clare)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Credit Acceptance Corporation answer due 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/4/2022. (arw)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kruse, Natalia)
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Natalia S. Kruse for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kruse, Natalia)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Marci V. Kawski for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Kawski, Marci)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions Inc. answer due 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/28/2022. (voc)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fogarty, Clare)
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Fogarty, Clare)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Clare Elizabeth Fogarty for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Fogarty, Clare)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Clare Elizabeth Fogarty Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/28/2022. (lak)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Clare Elizabeth Fogarty Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3045343.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fogarty, Clare)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service on to Credit Acceptance Corporation) (Hussain, Syed)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions Inc. served on 4/15/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of Service on to Experian) (Hussain, Syed)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-3036310) filed by Grashan Wilson. (Attachments: #1 CAC Summons, #2 Army & Air Force Exchange Service Summons, #3 Experian Summons, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hussain, Syed) Modified on 4/12/2022. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson, Grashan v. Experian Information Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grashan Wilson
Represented By: Syed Haseeb Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Clare Elizabeth Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Lisa M. Lawless
Represented By: Marci V. Kawski
Represented By: Natalia S. Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Army & Air Force Exchange Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?