Walker, Marcellous et al v. Boughton, Gary et al
Plaintiff: Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks, Kendrick Gatlin and Damien Griffin
Defendant: Gary Boughton, Dane Esser, Wendy Monfils, Sarah Cooper, Robert Miller, Anthony Broadbent, TextBehind, Wisconsin Department of Corrections, Jacob Cirian and Mark Kartman
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00211
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 48 Declaration of Marcellous L. Walker by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker. (jef),(ps)
June 6, 2022 Party Jammie Yerks is terminated, no filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis submitted by the May 18, 2022 deadline. (lam),(ps)
June 6, 2022 Party Jeremy Wand is terminated, no initial partial filing fee submitted by the May 26, 2022 deadline. (lam),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Filing 47 Warden PLRA Letter as to plaintiff Marcellous Walker. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Initial Partial Filing fee received from plaitiff Marcellous Walker: $ 41.06, receipt number 34690040648. (jef),(ps)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER on ifp request as to plaintiff Kendrick Gatlin: Initial partial filing fee of $ 76.00 assessed. Plaintiff Kendrick Gatlin's Initial partial filing fee due 6/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/1/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 27, 2022 Filing 45 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kendrick Gatlin. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2022: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
May 27, 2022 Filing 44 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kendrick Gatlin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 24, 2022 Filing 43 Warden PLRA Letter for Plaintiff Armin Wand, III. (aom),(ps)
May 23, 2022 Initial Partial Filing fee received from plaintiff Armin Wand: $ 24.59, receipt number 34690040620. (aom),(ps) Modified on 5/24/2022 (jef).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff Walker: Initial partial filing fee of $ 41.06 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/18/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Filing 41 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Filing 40 Declaration of Exhibits by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1 - WI DAI Undeliverable PIOC Mail Notification, #3 Exhibit 2 - Inmate Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document, #5 Exhibit 4 - TextBehind Document, Letter Dated 03/20/22, Unsigned Declaration, Signed Letter Dated 03/31/22, Copy of Envelope from Damien Griffin, #6 Exhibit 5 - Inmate Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #8 Exhibit 7 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #9 Exhibit 8 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #10 Exhibit 9 - Inmate Complaint Appeal, #11 Exhibit 10 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #12 Exhibit 11 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document, #13 Exhibit 12 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document, #14 Exhibit 13 - Inmate Complaint Appeal, #15 Exhibit 14 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document, #16 Exhibit 15 - Inmate Complaint, #17 Exhibit 16 - TextBehind Document, Copy of Envelope from Jamie Yerks, Letter from Jammie Dated 03-30-2022, Copy of NEF Case 19-cv-595-wmc, Copy of USDC-WIWD Motion for Cost Case 19-cv-595, Copy of Bill of Costs Case 19-cv-595, and Copy of Certificate of Service, #18 Exhibit 17 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-6453 Document, #19 Exhibit 18 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-6453 Document, #20 Exhibit 19 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-6453 Document, #21 Exhibit 20 - Inmate Complaint Appeal, #22 Exhibit 21 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-6453 Document, #23 Exhibit 22 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #24 Exhibit 23 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Document, #25 Exhibit 24 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document, #26 Exhibit 25 - Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Document) (aom),(ps)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that Plaintiff Walker submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/16/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 16, 2022 Filing 38 Declaration of Marcellous Walker by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker re #36 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #37 Amended Complaint (aom),(ps)
May 16, 2022 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Armin Wand, III, Marcellous Walker, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks, and Kendrick Gatlin. (aom),(ps)
May 16, 2022 Filing 36 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (aom),(ps)
May 11, 2022 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 26 Text Only Order. Mail re-sent to Jammie Yerks at Jackson Correctional Insititution. (jef),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 34 Copy of #28 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jeremy Wand. (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 33 Signed Copy of #27 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeremy Wand. (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff Armin Wand, III: Initial partial filing fee of $ 24.59 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/05/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 31 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Armin Wand, III (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff Jeremy Wand: Initial partial filing fee of $ 5.40 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/05/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 29 Disregard. (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 28 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jeremy Wand (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 5, 2022 Filing 27 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (unsigned) by Plaintiff Jeremy Wand. See dkt. #33 for signed copy. (aom),(ps) Modified on 5/5/2022 (aom).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On April 13, 2022, six inmates at the Wisconsin Secure Program Facility filed this lawsuit under 42 U.S.C. 1983. In addition to a complaint, and a motion to amend their complaint by adding defendants, plaintiffs have filed a motion for preliminary injunctive relief as well as supporting declarations and exhibits. Plaintiffs have not yet paid their filing fees or requested leave to proceed without prepayment. However, the court will nonetheless address plaintiff Damien M. Griffin's declaration attesting that he has not read or signed any filings submitted on his behalf in this case and does not wish to participate. (Dkt. #25 .) Based on Griffin's assertions, the court construes his declaration as a motion to withdraw as a plaintiff from this action and GRANTS the motion. The clerk of court is directed to amend the case caption accordingly. The remaining plaintiffs are advised that if it comes to light that their submissions to the court have included any misrepresentations, they may be subject to penalties up to and including dismissal of their claims in this lawsuit with prejudice. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/3/2022. (jef),(ps)
April 27, 2022 Filing 25 Declaration of Damien M. Griffin by Plaintiff Damien Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4 - Disbursement requests, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
April 27, 2022 Filing 24 Disregard; duplicate entry. (jef).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #21 motion for use of release account funds to pay the entire filing fee in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/26/2022. (jef),(ps)
April 18, 2022 Filing 22 Second Declaration of Marcellous Walker filed by Plaintiff Marcellous Walker re: #21 Motion for Order to Allow Plaintiff Walker to Pay Full Filing Fee from His Prison Release Account (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1(a) - Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 1(b) - Interview/Information Request, #3 Exhibit 2 - Copy of April Trust Fund Account Statement) (aom),(ps)
April 18, 2022 Filing 21 Motion for Order to Allow Plaintiff Walker to Pay Full Filing Fee from His Prison Release Account by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (aom),(ps)
April 18, 2022 Filing 20 Motion to Substitute by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff Griffin submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff Gatlin submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Plaintiff Yerks submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Plaintiff Wand to submit $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Plaintiff Wand, IIII submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff Walker submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/13/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 Declaration of Exhibits filed by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks re: #2 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-001 - E-005 - WI DOC DAI Acknowledgement of Receipt of/Access to/Information) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 Declaration of Exhibits filed by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks re: #2 Motion for TRO, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-001 - D-005 - WI DOC 309 Policy and Procedures, WI DOC DAI Policies 309.04.01 and 309.15.01, and Interview/Information Request) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 11 Declaration of Exhibits filed by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks re: #2 Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-001 - C-006 - WI DAI Undeliverable PIOC Mail Notification, Inmate Complaints, Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5351 Documents, TextBehind Documents, Copies of Letters and Envelope from Griffin to Walker, and Complaint Number WSPF-2022-5747 Documents) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration of Exhibits filed by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks re: #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-001 - B-007 - TextBehind Documents, WI DAI Undeliverable PIOC Mail Notification, Copy of Envelopes and Letters to Walker, Adult Conduct Report, Copy of Envelopes, Supporting Report, Primary Report, and Unapproved Draft from Grant County Sheriff's Office, Letter to Department Dated 08/19/21, Gatlin Criminal Complaint, Officers Intake Protect Information, and Disbursement Request) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 Declaration of Exhibits filed by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks re: #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-001 - A-010 - Letter from DAI Admin Sarah Cooper Dated 11/04/21 Regarding New Mail Process, TextBehind Documents, Letter from DAI Admin Sarah Cooper Dated 11/12/21 Regarding Mailing Information and P.O. Box, Letter from DAI Admin Sarah Cooper Dated 12/3/21 Regarding New Mail Policy, Letter from Security Chief Miller Dated 12/9/21 Regarding Consent to Receive Mail, Letter from OMB Director Monfils Dated 12/22/21 and 02/10/22 Regarding Acknowledgement of Rules, Interview/Information Request, and Letter from Warden Boughton Dated 02/08/22) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 Declaration of Jammie Yerks by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 Declaration of Armin G. Wand III by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Declaration of Korey A. Warren by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 Declaration of Marcellous Walker by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Memorandum of Law in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Kendrick Gatlin, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks, Armin Wand, III, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Kendrick Gatlin, Damien Griffin, Marcellous Walker, Armin Wand, III, Jeremy Wand, Jammie Yerks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Statement of Proposed Findings of Fact) (aom),(ps)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service) (aom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker, Marcellous et al v. Boughton, Gary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcellous Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armin Wand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jammie Yerks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Monfils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Broadbent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TextBehind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Cirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?