Libertas Funding LLC v. Libertas Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: Libertas Funding, LLC and Libertas Funding LLC
Defendant: Libertas Technologies Inc. and Libertas Technologies Inc
Case Number: 0:2021cv00121
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Libertas Funding LLC, Counter Defendant Libertas Funding LLC. Modified text on 8/4/2021 (Court Staff, skb). Modified to remove proposed order on 8/6/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
August 2, 2021 Filing 19 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss #14 Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Libertas Funding LLC, Counter Defendant Libertas Funding LLC. (Wheatley, Lucy) Modified text and to add link on 8/4/2021 (Court Staff, skb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, skb).
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 PARTIAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #14 Defendants' Counterclaims by Libertas Funding LLC. (Wheatley, Lucy) Modified text and add link on 8/4/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned from the Honorable Kelly H Rankin to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjl)
July 21, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Claire Hagan Eller. Receipt CHY035026. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 21, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Lucy Jewett Wheatley. Receipt CHY035025. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Lucy Jewett Wheatley on behalf of Libertas Funding LLC (Wheatley, Lucy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Claire Hagan Eller on behalf of Libertas Funding LLC (Eller, Claire)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, , COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Libertas Funding LLC by Libertas Technologies Inc. (Hutchins, Clyde)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF LUCY JEWETT WHEATLEY AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF LIBERTAS FUNDING LLC by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin, re: #11 Motion to appear pro hac vice. (Emailed counsel) (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (Court Staff, smxb).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CLAIRE HAGAN ELLER AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF LIBERTAS FUNDING LLC by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin, re: #10 Motion to appear pro hac vice. (Emailed counsel). (Court Staff, smxb) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (Court Staff, smxb).
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Lucy Jewett Wheatley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Libertas Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Buckley, Lucas)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Claire Hagan Eller to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Libertas Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Buckley, Lucas)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde William Hutchins, Jr on behalf of Libertas Technologies Inc (Hutchins, Clyde)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Libertas Funding LLC. Libertas Technologies Inc served on 6/24/2021, answer due on 7/15/2021 (Buckley, Lucas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lee R. Dickinson on behalf of Libertas Funding LLC (Dickinson, Lee)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued (Court Staff, sal)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, sal)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Libertas Funding, LLC ; this case is non-complex. (Buckley, Lucas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Libertas Funding, LLC (Buckley, Lucas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Libertas Funding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Buckley, Lucas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT against Libertas Technologies Inc. with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BWYDC-1951917)Attorney Lucas Evan Buckley added to party Libertas Funding, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Libertas Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buckley, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libertas Funding LLC v. Libertas Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertas Funding, LLC
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Libertas Funding LLC
Represented By: Lee R. Dickinson
Represented By: Claire Hagan Eller
Represented By: Lucy Jewett Wheatley
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libertas Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libertas Technologies Inc
Represented By: Clyde William Hutchins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?