Vierbuchen v. United States of America President et al
Plaintiff: Margaret M Vierbuchen
Defendant: United States of America President, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Attorney General, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney for Wyoming, Joseph R Biden, Jr, United States Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zients, United States Department of Justice, Merrick B Garland, Lee J Lofthus and L Robert Murray
Case Number: 0:2022cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's request to enjoin Executive Order 14043 is denied without prejudice, while her request to enjoin the DOJ's COVID-19 testing protocol for unvaccinated employees is denied with prejudice. (Court Staff, skb)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #16 Motion to Extend Defendant's Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendant's responsive pleading deadline in this case is extended until 14 days after the date on which the Court has issued a written ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #10 (Court Staff, scat)
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Defendants' responsive pleading deadline filed by Defendants General Services Administration, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for Wyoming, United States Department of Justice, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF to #14 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Margaret M Vierbuchen. (Block, Andrew) Modified text and added link on 2/28/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 17, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants General Services Administration, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for Wyoming, United States Department of Justice, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Christianson Declaration) (Hagerty, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/23/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
February 9, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Hagerty on behalf of General Services Administration, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for Wyoming, United States Department of Justice, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, United States of America President (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #9 MOTION for Elizabeth Hagerty to appear pro hac vice as Counsel for the Defendants and Excusing Assistant United States Attorney from Further Participation . (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 3, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Margaret M Vierbuchen. (Block, Andrew)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Margaret M Vierbuchen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Signed Affidavit of Ms. Vierbuchen)(Block, Andrew)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Elizabeth Hagerty to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants General Services Administration, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for Wyoming, United States Department of Justice, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Hagerty, #2 SA Appointment, #3 Proposed Order)(Martin, C) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/15/2022 to flatten document) (Court Staff, skb).
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of General Services Administration, General Services Administration Administrator, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Management and Budget Acting Director, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator, United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration, United States Attorney General, United States Attorney for Wyoming, United States Department of Justice, United States Office of Personnel Management, United States Office of Personnel Management Director, United States of America President (Martin, C)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret M Vierbuchen. General Services Administration served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; General Services Administration Administrator served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; Office of Management and Budget served on 1/14/2022, answer due on 3/15/2022; Office of Management and Budget Acting Director served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; Safer Federal Workforce Task Force served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration served on 1/14/2022, answer due on 3/15/2022; United States Attorney General served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; United States Attorney for Wyoming served on 1/6/2022, answer due on 3/7/2022; United States Department of Justice served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; United States Office of Personnel Management served on 1/10/2022, answer due on 3/11/2022; United States Office of Personnel Management Director served on 1/14/2022, answer due on 3/15/2022; United States of America President served on 1/14/2022, answer due on 3/15/2022. Served through the General Services Administration; Office of Management and Budget; Kiran Ahuja, Director; Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President; Robin Carnahan, Administrator, Ceneral Services Administration; United States Department of Justice; Merrick Garland, Attorney General; Lee J. Lofthus, Assistant Attorney General; L. Robert Murray, United States Attorney; Office of Personnel Management; Safer Federal Workforce Task Force; Shalanda Young, Acting Director, Office of Management and Budget; the United States. (Court Staff, skb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Andrew Block on behalf of Margaret M Vierbuchen (Block, Andrew)
January 18, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ANDREW BLOCK. RECEIPT CHY035806. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #3 MOTION for Andrew Block to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Margaret M Vierbuchen. (cc: Email to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. The Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin are both recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl for all further proceedings.(Court Staff, szf)
January 13, 2022 Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION for Andrew Block to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; (Court Staff, szf)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H. Rankin. MOTION for Andrew Block to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Margaret M Vierbuchen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew Block)(Knepper, John) Modified docket on January 18, 2022 (Court Staff, szf).
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Knepper on behalf of Margaret M Vierbuchen (Court Staff, sbh)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Margaret M Vierbuchen (13 summons(es) issued; Filing fee $402 receipt #CHY035759) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vierbuchen v. United States of America President et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America President
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management Director
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration Administrator
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget Acting Director
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force Co-Chair and COVID-19 Response Coordinator
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Assistant Attorney General for Administration
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for Wyoming
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Young
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee J Lofthus
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Robert Murray
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M Vierbuchen
Represented By: John G Knepper
Represented By: Andrew Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?