State of Wyoming v. United States Department of Interior et al
Petitioner: State of Wyoming
Respondent: United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service, Debra Anne Haaland and United States Department of Interior Secretary
Case Number: 1:2022cv00247
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; filed by United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management, United States Forest Service. (Court Staff, stbd)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Sawyer Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Forest Service (Martin, C)
December 15, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. Bureau of Land Management served on 12/5/2022, answer due on 2/3/2023; United States Department of Interior served on 12/5/2022, answer due on 2/3/2023; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 12/7/2022, answer due on 2/5/2023; United States Forest Service served on 12/5/2022, answer due on 2/3/2023. Served through the United States Department of Interior; United States Forest Service; Bureau of Land Management; Debra Haaland, Secretary of Department of Interior. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Bureau of Land Management, #2 Proof of Service - Civil Process Clerk U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 Proof of Service - U.S. Department of Interior, #4 Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, #5 Proof of Service - Debra Haaland, Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Interior, #6 Proof of Service - U.S. Forest Service) (Jordan, Travis)
December 1, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Petition for Review of Final Agency Action) against Defendant Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Forest Service, filed by State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1989 Office of Solicitor Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 2 - February 22, 2021 USFS Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2021 Oil & Gas Lease Sale Planning Schedule, #4 Exhibit 4 - September 13, 2021 USFS Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 5 - February 12, 2021 Office of Solicitor Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 6 - BLM NEPA Register, #7 Exhibit 7 - February 4, 2021 Request for Authorization) (Jordan, Travis)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment; The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (Presiding Judge) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Referral Judge). (Court Staff, stbd)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. David DeWald on behalf of State of Wyoming (DeWald, D. David)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Steven Jordan on behalf of State of Wyoming (Jordan, Travis)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW. ( Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-2190357.), filed by State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1989 Office of Solicitor Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 2 - February 22, 2021 USFS Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2021 Oil & Gas Lease Sale Planning Schedule, #4 Exhibit 4 - September 13, 2021 USFS Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 5 - February 12, 2021 Office of Solicitor Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 6 - BLM NEPA Register, #7 Exhibit 7 - February 4, 2021 Request for Authorization, #8 Summons - BLM, #9 Summons - Dep't of Interior, #10 Summons - Dep't of Justice, #11 Summons - Haaland, #12 Summons - Civil Process Clerk, #13 Summons - U.S. Forest Service, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jordan, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Wyoming v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wyoming
Represented By: D. David DeWald
Represented By: Travis Steven Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Forest Service
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra Anne Haaland
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?