State of Wyoming v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Petitioner: Independent Petroleum Association of America, State of Colorado, Petroleum Association of Wyoming and Western Energy Alliance
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, Sally Jewell, United States Department of the Interior and Neil Kornze
Not Yet Classified: Ute Indian Tribe, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, Western Resource Advocates, State of Utah, State of North Dakota, Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks and Sierra Club
Amicus Curiae: Wyoming County Commissioners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00043
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 258 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.Pursuant to the opinion of the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals dated September 21, 2017, vacating this Court's Judgment, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Skavdahl, Scott)
September 21, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Glenn E Roper. Receipt CHY029538. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (244) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Glenn E Roper for State of Colorado in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (256) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Glenn E Roper for State of Colorado in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sal)
September 17, 2018 Filing 256 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Glenn E. Roper to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A Declaration of Glenn E. Roper, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Glenn E. Roper)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(La, Eva)
September 6, 2018 Filing 255 NOTICE by Petitioner State of Colorado of Withdrawal of Counsel Frederick R. Yarger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (La, Eva) Modified text on 9/11/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
June 5, 2018 Filing 254 MANDATE of USCA denying motions to dismiss re (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal and (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Court Staff, ssw)
May 10, 2018 Filing 253 NOTICE by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (251) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting (239) in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS. Attorney Andrew J Kuhlmann terminated in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS.Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sms)
April 16, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Petitioner State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Kuhlmann, Andrew)
April 12, 2018 Filing 250 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eva La on behalf of State of Colorado Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (La, Eva)
January 12, 2018 Filing 249 APPEAL ORDER from USCA; Appellants shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss as Moot/For Lack of Jurisdiction as to Ute Lands and Suggestion of Mootness as to Other Lands with the 10th Circuit on or before January 22, 2018. Issuance of the mandates in these matters is stayed pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 1/30/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 APPEAL ORDER from USCA filed by Judges Briscoe, Hartz and Holmes denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Ute Indian Tribe, by Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Colorado, State of Utah, and State of Wyoming, and the Industry Petitioners-Appellees' request for panel and en banc rehearing on timing of vacatur. [16-8068, 16-8069] All three petitions and the responses were also circulated to all of the judges of this court who are in regular active service and who are not disqualified. As no member of the original panel and no judge in regular active service requested that the court be polled, the requests for en banc rehearing are likewise denied. Finally, in accord with the request made in the federal appellants' response, the Clerk is directed to stay issuance of the mandate in these matters until 1/12/2018. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 6, 2017 Filing 247 10th Circuit Filing - Order by the 10th Circuit to parties: This matter is before the court on Appellees State of North Dakota, State of Colorado, State of Utah, and State of Wyomings Petition for Panel Rehearing And/Or Request for En Banc Determination (The Petition). The appellants shall file a response to the Petition on or before November 20, 2017. Docketed here for informational purposes only. (Court Staff, sds)
July 27, 2017 Filing 246 10th Circuit Filing - Case argued by Andrew Mergen and Michael Freeman for the Appellants; James Kaste, Paul Seby, Mark Barron and Jeffrey Rasmussen for the Appellees; and submitted to Judges Briscoe, Hartz and Holmes as to 16-8068. (Court Staff, sds)
August 15, 2016 Filing 245 CLERK'S Bill of Costs regarding (235 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) (223 in 2:15-CV-00041-SWS) Bill of Costs filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota awarded costs in the amount of $264.25. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified text on 8/15/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 12, 2016 Filing 244 CLERK'S Bill of Costs regarding (232 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS)(220 in 2:15-CV-00041-SWS) Bill of Costs filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America and Western Energy Alliance awarded costs in the amount of $400.00. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified text on 8/15/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 1, 2016 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Support of (235 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Bill of Costs filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
July 27, 2016 Filing 242 RESPONSE TO #241 FEDERAL RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO BILL OF COSTS filed by Petitioner Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Burgess, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael Burgess) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified on 7/28/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
July 27, 2016 Filing 241 OBJECTION to (235 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Bill of Costs filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
July 21, 2016 Filing 240 OBJECTION to (232 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Bill of Costs filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Schwarz, Jody)
July 20, 2016 Filing 239 Appeal Notification re (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. Filed notice record is complete. Briefing shall follow the schedule set forth in the court's Order filed on 7/13/16. [16-8068, 16-8069] (Court Staff, sdf)
July 20, 2016 Filing 238 Transcript Letter transmitted to USCA 16-8068 and 16-8069( #221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, ( #223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. No transcripts have been ordered for this appeal. For purpose of appeal, the record is now ready. (Court Staff, sdf) (Main Document 238 replaced on 7/20/2016) (Court Staff, sdf). Modified on 7/22/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER ON MANDATE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl VACATING #130 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to ( #162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, ( #148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sdf)
July 13, 2016 Filing 236 MANDATE of USCA REMANDING (130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) #130 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for TRO, ( #162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, ( #148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society. Remanded with instructions to vacate the order granting the preliminary injunction dated 9/30/15. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Lucero, Holmes and McHugh [15-8126, 15-8134] (Attachments: #1 Mandate) (Court Staff, sdf)
July 13, 2016 Filing 235 BILL OF COSTS filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (221) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS and granting (233) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. North Dakota has until 7/13/2016 to file its Bill of Costs. (Court Staff, smp) (Main Document 234 replaced on 7/11/2016) (Court Staff, szf).
July 6, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline for Bill of Costs filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Seby, Paul) Modified document security and corresponding text on 7/14/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
July 6, 2016 Filing 232 BILL OF COSTS filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
July 1, 2016 Filing 231 (TEXT-ONLY) APPEAL ORDER from USCA as to (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society (Record on appeal/Notice due 7/26/2016) Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/26/2016 for Stephan Harris, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [16-8069] (Court Staff, sdf)
June 30, 2016 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (No Transcripts Necessary) by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society re (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. (Freeman, Michael)
June 29, 2016 Filing 229 APPEAL ORDER from USCA as to (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior (Record on appeal/Notice due 7/25/2016) Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/25/2016 for Stephan Harris, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [16-8068] (Court Staff, sdf)
June 29, 2016 Filing 228 Appeal Number 16-8069 received from USCA for (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. Docketing statement and Transcript order form due 07/13/2016 for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society. Notice of appearance due on 07/13/2016 for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, State of Colorado, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, Ute Indian Tribe, Western Energy Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society [16-8069] (Court Staff, sdf)
June 29, 2016 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (No Transcripts Necessary) by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary re (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. (Jaffe, Rebecca)
June 28, 2016 Filing 226 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, The procedures and appeals packet may be obtained from our website at www.wyd.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet) (Court Staff, sdf)
June 27, 2016 Filing 225 Appeal Number 16-8068 received from USCA for (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. Docketing statement due 07/11/2016 for Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of the Interior. Transcript order form due 07/11/2016 for David Aiken Carson, William E. Gerard, Jody H. Schwarz, Stephen R. Terrell and Nicholas Vassallo. Notice of appearance due on 07/11/2016 for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, State of Colorado, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Chamber of Commerce, United States Department of the Interior, Ute Indian Tribe and Western Energy Alliance [16-8068] (Court Staff, sdf)
June 27, 2016 Filing 224 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number CAS1700 re (223 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society (Court Staff, sdf)
June 27, 2016 Filing 223 NOTICE OF APPEAL 16-8069 as to (220 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Judgment, (219 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Freeman, Michael) Modified text on 6/27/2016 (Court Staff, sjc). Modified on 6/29/2016 (Court Staff, sdf). Modified on 7/8/2016 (Court Staff, sdf).
June 24, 2016 Filing 222 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re (221 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, The procedures and appeals packet may be obtained from our website at www.wyd.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal) (Court Staff, stbd)
June 24, 2016 Filing 221 NOTICE OF APPEAL (16-8068) as to (219 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 220 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Gerard, William) Modified on 6/24/2016 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified on 6/27/2016: add USCA number (Court Staff, sdf). Modified on 7/8/2016: added link (Court Staff, sdf).
June 22, 2016 Filing 220 JUDGMENT in favor of Petitioners. (Attachments: #1 Bill of Costs)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER on (1 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Petitions for Review of Final Agency Action by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. The Court holds the Fracking Rule is unlawful, and it is ORDERED that the Bureau of Land Managment's final rule related to hydraulic fracturing on federal and Indian lands, 80 Fed. Reg. 16,128 (Mar. 26, 2015), is hereby SET ASIDE. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds) Modified on 6/22/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
May 3, 2016 Filing 218 REPLY to (217 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Filing 217 RESPONSE to (216 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Peer-Reviewed Pavillion, Wyoming Study filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gross, Jeremy) Modified on 5/2/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 27, 2016 Filing 216 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Peer-Reviewed Pavillion, Wyoming Study by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society, Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. The Citizen Groups submit these articles in RESPONSE to the extra-record evidence offered by Colorado, Wyoming and Utah (the States) in their April 18, 2016 #209 Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified on 4/28/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 25, 2016 Filing 215 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathan Douglas Matthews, attorney on behalf of Sierra Club Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Matthews, Nathan)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (201) Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limits in Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS and 2:15-cv-00041-SWS.(Court Staff, smp)
April 18, 2016 Filing 213 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Reply in Support of Petitioners' Arguments on the Merits filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limits)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Barron, Mark)
April 18, 2016 Filing 212 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Arguments on the Merits re (192 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (206 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, in Support of Petitioners' Arguments on the Merits filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified on 4/19/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 18, 2016 Filing 211 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF UTE INDIAN TRIBE'S #193 MERITS BRIEF filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified title on 4/19/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 18, 2016 Filing 210 North Dakota's REPLY BRIEF in Support of (190 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief of North Dakota filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul) Modified on 4/19/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 18, 2016 Filing 209 REPLY BRIEF in Support of (189 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (205 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response, (206 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gross, Jeremy) Modified on 4/19/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
April 14, 2016 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Pro hac vice fee paid. Receipt No. CAS001651, $100 Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sdf)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting (195) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Joel Minor for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, and Wilderness Society in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (207) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Joel Minor for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, and Wilderness Society in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szf) Text modified on 4/18/2016 (Court Staff, szf).
April 13, 2016 Filing 207 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Joel Minor to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Hayes, Megan)
April 4, 2016 Filing 206 BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO MERITS BRIEFS OF INDUSTRY AND STATE PETITIONERS re (192 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (189 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (190 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
April 4, 2016 Filing 205 Merits Brief re (192 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (189 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief, (193 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Permanent Injunction, (190 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Brief filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Text Modified on 4/7/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
April 4, 2016 Filing 204 RESPONSE to the Ute Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation's Merits Brief re(193 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Permanent Injunction, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Schwarz, Jody) Text Modified on 4/7/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING (200) Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response Brief. (Court Staff, smp)
March 23, 2016 Filing 202 Memorandum "Reply" in Support of (200 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified on 3/24/2016 (Court Staff, sds). Text Modified on 4/18/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
March 22, 2016 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re (200 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/23/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
March 22, 2016 Filing 200 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Freeman, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
March 15, 2016 Filing 199 RESPONSE to (196 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Order, filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (McGrady, Michael)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING Motion to File a Consolidated Brief. (Court Staff, smp)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin DENYING (195) Motion to File Amicus Brief. (Court Staff, smp)
March 15, 2016 Filing 196 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to File Consolidated Brief filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Jaffe, Rebecca) Modified on 3/21/2016 - Granted #185 (Court Staff, sds).
March 11, 2016 Filing 195 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS filed by Movant Petroleum Association of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amicus Curiae Brief)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Woita, Maegan) Modified title on 3/14/2016 (Court Staff, sds). Modified on 3/21/2016 - Denied. (Court Staff, sds).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits re: (178) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; and (191) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
March 4, 2016 Filing 193 UTE INDIAN TRIBE OF THE UINTAH AND OURAY RESERVATION MERITS BRIEF filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified document security, title and event type on 3/7/2016 (Court Staff, sds). NEF regenerated.
March 4, 2016 Filing 192 Opening Memorandum BRIEF on the Merits filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
March 4, 2016 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Barron, Mark)
March 4, 2016 Filing 190 Opening BRIEF re (109 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Petition for Review filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
March 4, 2016 Filing 189 BRIEF in Support of Petition for Review filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gross, Jeremy)
February 26, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe to Withdraw as Counsel Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Reagen, Christopher)
February 10, 2016 Filing 187 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Pursuant to Petitioners' Notices of Withdrawal, Petitioners' Motions to Complete the Administrative Record #137 & #138 are terminated. (Court Staff, smp)
February 9, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION AND INTENT TO FILE OPENING MEMORANDUM ON THE MERITS filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance withdrawing (137 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (117 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Stipulation, (113 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice (Other),,, Motion to Modify the Administrative Record,. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified on 2/10/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
February 9, 2016 Filing 185 STATE PETITIONERS NOTICE REGARDING CORRECTED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by State of Colorado, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wyoming withdrawing (138 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Joint MOTION for Order to Complete Administrative Record. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul) Modified on 2/10/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
January 19, 2016 Filing 184 NOTICE by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management, Secretary of the US Department of the Interior of Lodging of Corrected Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certification of the Corrected Administrative Record) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
January 19, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Administrative Record. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sjc)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING (181) Motion for Extension of Time. On or by February 9, 2016, State Petitioners and Industry Petitioners each will either re-file their Motions to Complete, with or without revisions, or file a notice indicating that they have withdrawn their Motions to Complete AND Federal Respondents responses to those Motions to Complete will be postponed until after Petitioners re-file or withdraw their Motions, such that any such response will be due 14 days after any Motion to Complete is refiled. However, as the Court has extended numerous deadlines in this case, the Court notes this will be the final extension of time provided to the parties regarding the completion of the administrative record and the briefing schedule. (Court Staff, smp) Modified on 1/12/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
January 8, 2016 Filing 181 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Modify Briefing Schedule for Motions to Complete and Modify Administrative Record filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William) Modified on 3/21/2016 - Granted by #169 (Court Staff, sds).
January 7, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael James McGrady, attorney on behalf of State of Wyoming Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (McGrady, Michael)
January 4, 2016 Filing 179 Transcript Letter transmitted to USCA re (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, All transcripts for this appeal are already on file with this court. For purposes of appeal, the record is now ready. (Court Staff, sdf)
January 4, 2016 Filing 178 Transcript Letter transmitted to USCA re (162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, All transcripts for this appeal are already on file with this court. For purposes of appeal, the record is now ready. (Court Staff, sdf)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying #155 Motion to Bifurcate and Expedite Briefing on Legal Authority by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
December 24, 2015 Filing 176 (TEXT-ONLY) APPEAL MINUTE ORDER from USCA. (Record on appeal/Notice due 1/19/2016) (Court Staff, sjc)
December 24, 2015 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Transcripts Already on File) by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary re (162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal. (Court Staff, sjc)
December 18, 2015 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Transcripts Already on File) by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary re (162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. (Jaffe, Rebecca) (Main Document 174 replaced on 1/12/2016) (Court Staff, sjc).
December 18, 2015 Filing 173 REPLY to (167 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Jaffe, Rebecca)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying (130) Motion for Judgment or to Stay Case in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; denying (143) Motion for Judgment or to Stay Case in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
December 17, 2015 Filing 170 REPLY to (163 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Jaffe, Rebecca)
December 15, 2015 Filing 171 Appeal Number 15-8134 received from USCA for (162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. Docketing statement due 12/29/2015 for Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of the Interior. Transcript order form due 12/29/2015 for Rebecca Jaffe. Notice of appearance due on 12/29/2015 for Independent Petroleum Association of America, Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, State of Colorado, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, Ute Indian Tribe and Western Energy Alliance. [15-8134] (Court Staff, sdf)
December 15, 2015 Filing 169 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re (162 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, The procedures and appeals packet may be obtained from our website at www.wyd.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Preliminary ROA including NOA) (Court Staff, sdf)
December 14, 2015 Filing 168 RESPONSE to (155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion to Bifurcate,, Motion to Expedite, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
December 11, 2015 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re (155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion to Bifurcate,, Motion to Expedite, filed by Petitioner Independent Petroleum Association of America. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING (165) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lauren R. Caplan no longer associated with the case. (Court Staff, smp)
December 11, 2015 Filing 165 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Withdraw Lauren R. Caplan as Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, skl) Modified - Granted by #153 . on 3/21/2016 (Court Staff, sds).
December 10, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota of Withdrawal as Counsel Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Emrich, Andrew)
December 10, 2015 Filing 163 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition re (155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 155 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion to Bifurcate,, Motion to Expedite, filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
December 10, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Jaffe, Rebecca)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING (159) Motion to Substitute Attorney. (Court Staff, smp)
December 8, 2015 Filing 159 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Walker, Robert) Modified on 3/21/2016 - Granted by #147 (Court Staff, sds).
December 8, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert John Walker on behalf of State of North Dakota Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Walker, Robert)
December 7, 2015 Filing 161 (TEXT-ONLY) APPEAL ORDER from USCA as to (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society (Record on appeal/Notice due 1/4/2016) Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/04/2016 for Stephan Harris, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [15-8126] (Court Staff, sdf)
December 7, 2015 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Transcripts Already on File) by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society re (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal,. (Freeman, Michael)
December 7, 2015 Filing 156 REPLY to (152 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response to Motion, (153 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, (154 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
November 30, 2015 Filing 155 MOTION to Bifurcate , MOTION to Expedite filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Jaffe, Rebecca)
November 30, 2015 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re (143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Judgment,,, Motion to Stay Case,, filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
November 30, 2015 Filing 153 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition re (143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Judgment,,, Motion to Stay Case,, filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
November 30, 2015 Filing 152 RESPONSE to (143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 143 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Judgment,,, Motion to Stay Case,, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Jaffe, Rebecca)
November 27, 2015 Filing 151 Appeal Number 15-8126 received from USCA for (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society. Docketing statement due 12/11/2015 for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society. Transcript order form due 12/11/2015 for Michael S. Freeman. Notice of appearance due on 12/11/2015 for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, State of Colorado, State of North Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, Ute Indian Tribe, Western Energy Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 27, 2015 Filing 150 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal, The procedures and appeals packet may be obtained from our website at www.wyd.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Preliminary ROA including NOA) (Court Staff, stbd)
November 27, 2015 Filing 149 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number CAS1570 re (148 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice of Appeal filed by Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Western Resource Advocates, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Wilderness Society (Court Staff, stbd)
November 27, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #130 Order (2:15-cv-00043-SWS) filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Freeman, Michael) Modified text on 11/27/2015 (Court Staff, stbd).
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (133) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rebecca Jaffe for United States Bureau of Land Management,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Department of the Interior,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Department of the Interior Secretary,Rebecca Jaffe for Bureau of Land Management,Rebecca Jaffe for Secretary of the US Department of the Interior in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (146) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rebecca Jaffe for United States Bureau of Land Management,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Department of the Interior,Rebecca Jaffe for United States Department of the Interior Secretary,Rebecca Jaffe for Bureau of Land Management,Rebecca Jaffe for Secretary of the US Department of the Interior in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
November 19, 2015 Filing 146 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rebecca Jaffe to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Vassallo, Nicholas)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL RESPONDENTS MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR RESPONSES TO MOTIONS TO COMPLETE AND MODIFY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD [DOC. 140]Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sjgc) Modified on 11/17/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
November 16, 2015 Filing 144 REPLY to (140 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive), filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
November 16, 2015 Filing 143 MOTION for Judgment , MOTION to stay case re (130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 130 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order for Final Judgment, #3 Proposed Order for Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Freeman, Michael)
November 13, 2015 Filing 142 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition re (140 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive), filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (McGrady, Michael)
November 13, 2015 Filing 141 RESPONSE to (140 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive), filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
November 12, 2015 Filing 140 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William) Modified on 3/21/2016. Granted by #132 Order. (Court Staff, sds).
November 12, 2015 Filing 139 NOTICE by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Terrell, Stephen)
November 6, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Order to Complete Administrative Record filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota, Intervenor State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 STATE PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Seby, Paul)
November 6, 2015 Filing 137 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct (117 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Stipulation, (113 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Notice (Other),,, Motion to Modify the Administrative Record, filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Client Privilege, #2 Exhibit B - Post-Decisional Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Deliberative Process & Withheld)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Barron, Mark)
November 2, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society, Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Nathan Maxon Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Maxon, Nathan)
November 2, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Hayes on behalf of Sierra Club Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Hayes, Megan)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING #133 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties have until 11/6/2015 to file motions to supplement or complete the administrative record. (Court Staff, smp)
October 16, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) FOR MOTIONS TO SUPPLEMENT OR COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING #131 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. (Court Staff, smp)
October 13, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Joint States' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Seby, Paul)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting (32) Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting (52) Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting (89) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. See order for further details. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sjc)
September 18, 2015 Filing 129 SUPPLEMENTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (89 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for TRO filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 128 SUPPLEMENTED PETITIONER/INTERVENOR UTE TRIBES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (104 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Reply, filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 127 RECORD CITATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order, filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 126 RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING OF SELECTIONS FROM ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society re (114 in 2:15-cv-00041-SWS, 125 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Memorandum in Opposition, Notice of Conventional Filing of Selections From Administrative Record Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Two discs received via Fed Ex. One forwarded to chambers, one put in exhibit expando. Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 125 RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CITATIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF MEMORANDUM in Opposition to (115 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 115 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 124 RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO INDUSTRY PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management, Secretary of the US Department of the Interior SUPPLEMENT re: ECF No. 20 in consolidated Case No. 15-CV-41-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 123 RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO UTE INDIAN TRIBES MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (102 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 122 RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO WYOMINGS AND COLORADOS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (68 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 121 RESPONDENTS SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO NORTH DAKOTAS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re (83 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM of ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CITATIONS IN SUPPORT OF NORTH DAKOTAS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION of (52 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Comment Letter) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 119 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD CITATIONS SUPPORTING AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE WYOMING COUNTY COMMISSIONERS ASSOCIATION SUPPLEMENT re (97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order, filed by Amicus Wyoming County Commissioners Association. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Cowan, Gregory) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 18, 2015 Filing 118 Citations to the Record in Support of Wyoming and Colorado's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (SUPPLEMENT) re (97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 97 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Order, filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming, Intervenor State of Utah. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gross, Jeremy) Modified title on 9/21/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 2, 2015 Filing 117 ERRATA - Correction of three figures in paragraph 4 of #113 Notice of Lodging of Administrative Record by Government. (Attachments: #1 (corrected) Certification of the Administrative Record) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified on 9/8/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO SUPPLEMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD as requested in (114 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS). The deadline to file motions to supplement or modify the record is set for October 16, 2015. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT CITATIONS by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl re (114 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive). Parties have until September 18, 2015 to file supplemental citations in support of arguments for the pending preliminary injunction motions. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds) Modified text on 9/3/2015 (Court Staff, stbd).
September 2, 2015 Filing 114 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Citations, #2 Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Motions to Supplement the Record)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Leggette, Lyle) Motion unreferred on 9/2/2015 (Court Staff, sal).
September 2, 2015 Motions No Longer Referred: (114 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive). Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sal)
August 27, 2015 Filing 113 Please See #117 ERRATA filed by Respondants correcting an error in this Certification. NOTICE Notice of Lodging of Administrative Record by Government Respondents. The Administrative Record, which includes both the Administrative Record - Public Submissions and a Record of all other documents considered in the course of the rulemaking, is contained on a set of nine DVD discs.1 Those discs also include an Index and, where applicable, a Privilege Log for documents in the record which were withheld or redacted for privilege or exemption. two sets of the Administrative Record discs along with two sets of the Index and Privilege Log in printed form Fed Exed to Clerk's office on 8/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Administrative Record) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William) Modified text on 8/28/2015 (Court Staff, sds). Modified text on 9/1/2015 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified on 9/8/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
August 12, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, R. Benjamin Nelson. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Nelson, R) Modified on 8/13/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (97) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (105) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Respondents to lodge the administratitive record is enlarged by 37 days, to and including August 28, 2015. This order does not alter the stay or any other elements of the Court's June 24, 2015 order.Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
July 16, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management, Secretary of the US Department of the Interior re (105 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Lodge the Administrative Record Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
July 15, 2015 Filing 106 RESPONSE to (105 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive),, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
July 15, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Lodge the Administrative Record filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Montel Declaration, #2 Exhibit Wells Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William)
July 8, 2015 Filing 104 REPLY to (102 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Rasmussen, Jeffrey) Modified document security on 7/9/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
July 8, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on June 23, 2015 before Judge Scott W. Skavdahl. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Anne Bowline, phone (307) 235-3376 or email anne@professionalreporting.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction.. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/15/2015. Notice of Redaction Request due 7/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2015. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Bowline, Anne)
July 1, 2015 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re (89 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for TRO filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Terrell, Stephen)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (92) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeremy J. Patterson for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (100) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeremy J. Patterson for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 30, 2015 Filing 100 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jeremy J. Patterson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Klosterman, Scott)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (90) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jody H Schwarz for United States Bureau of Land Management,Jody H Schwarz for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Jody H Schwarz for United States Department of the Interior,Jody H Schwarz for United States Department of the Interior Secretary in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (98) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jody H Schwarz for United States Bureau of Land Management,Jody H Schwarz for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Jody H Schwarz for United States Department of the Interior,Jody H Schwarz for United States Department of the Interior Secretary in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 25, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jody H. Schwarz to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Declaration)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Vassallo, Nicholas) (Main Document 98 replaced on 6/25/2015) (Court Staff, sds).
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER POSTPONING EFFECTIVE DATE OF AGENCY ACTION by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
June 24, 2015 Filing 96 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl: Preliminary Injunction - Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2015. For reasons stated on the record and incorporated by reference, the Court shall STAY the effective date of the FINAL RULE pending the filing of the Administrative Record. Within 7 calendar days of the lodging of the Administrative Record, parties may file citations in support of their positions. The Court intends to issue a ruling within two weeks thereafter. Also Ordered: The Government must Respond to the Ute Tribes Motion by July 1, and any Reply from the Ute Tribe is due on or before July 8th. (Court Reporter Anne Bowline.) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Attachments: #1 Intervener Petitioner Exhibits, #2 Government Exhibits, #3 Intervener Respondent Exhibits) (Court Staff, sds)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (80) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeffrey S. Rasmussen for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (88) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jeffrey S. Rasmussen for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (79) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Christopher Reagen for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (87) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Christopher Reagen for Ute Indian Tribe in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (83) Motion to Intervene in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS & #91 Motion to Intervene in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe added to case.Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr) Text modified on 6/23/2015 (Court Staff, szr).
June 22, 2015 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support of (91 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by UTE Tribe filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Support of (89 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for TRO filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 89 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 88 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jeffrey S. Rasmussen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Christopher J. Reagen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner Ute Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of Ute Indian Tribe Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Klosterman, Scott)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (76) Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (84) Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sjg)
June 19, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William)
June 19, 2015 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re (52 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Third) Wells Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
June 19, 2015 Filing 82 Second NOTICE by Intervenor State of Utah re (52 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction joinder in Motion Filed by North Dakota Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Frank, Daniel)
June 19, 2015 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re (52 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
June 18, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance re (13 in 2:15-cv-00041-SWS) Memorandum in Support of Motion, Notice of Supplemental Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Dan Naatz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 18, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE by Intervenor State of Utah re (32 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Joinder in Wyoming and Colorado Motions Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Frank, Daniel)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (69) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen R Terrell for United States Bureau of Land Management,Stephen R Terrell for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Stephen R Terrell for United States Department of the Interior,Stephen R Terrell for United States Department of the Interior Secretary in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (77) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen R Terrell for United States Bureau of Land Management,Stephen R Terrell for United States Bureau of Land Management Director,Stephen R Terrell for United States Department of the Interior,Stephen R Terrell for United States Department of the Interior Secretary in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 17, 2015 Filing 77 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Stephen R. Terrell to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting in part and denying in part (54) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting in part and denying in part (62) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS. Respondents have up to and including 7/22/2015 to lodge the administrative record. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sjg)
June 16, 2015 Filing 111 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by State of Utah (originally filed as additional attachment to doc #59 ). (Court Staff, sjc)
June 16, 2015 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re (62 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive),, filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gross, Jeremy)
June 16, 2015 Filing 74 OPPOSITION filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - May 13 2015 Letter from State Petitioners, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - May 27, 2015 Letter from Interior to North Dakota) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Seby, Paul)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (51) Motion to Intervene; granting (51) Motion to Intervene in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (59) Motion to Intervene; granting (59) Motion to Intervene in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, stbd)
June 15, 2015 Filing 72 REPLY to (45 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 15, 2015 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re (62 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive),, filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (63) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Petitioner to respond to the Motion for Extension of time on or before June 16, 2015. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sjgc)
June 12, 2015 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re (32 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Bureau of Land Managment Director, Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Wells Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Gerard, William)
June 12, 2015 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re (32 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (56) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting John Robinson, Jr for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (64) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting John Robinson, Jr for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (53) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Steven F Alder for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (61) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Steven F Alder for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 12, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John Robinson, Jr. to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Robinson Jr., #2 Proposed Order Admitting John Robinson Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Frank, Daniel)
June 12, 2015 Filing 63 Referred to Magistrate Rankin- MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Respondents' #62 Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Lodge the Administrative Record filed by Defendant Bureau of Land Managment Director, Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William) Modified on 6/12/2015 (Court Staff, sds). Modified on 6/15/2015 (Court Staff, sds).
June 12, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Lodge the Administrative Record filed by Defendant Bureau of Land Managment Director, Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wells Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Gerard, William)
June 12, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Steven F. Alder to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven F. Alder, #2 Proposed Order Admitting Steven F. Alder Pro Hac Vice)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Frank, Daniel)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (50) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Sean D. Reyes for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS; granting (58) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Sean D Reyes for State of Utah in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, szr)
June 12, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Utah filed by Intervenor State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 State of Utah's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 State of Utah's Proposed Petition for Review, #3 Proposed Order Granting State of Utah's Motion to Intervene)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS
June 12, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Sean D. Reyes to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean D. Reyes, #2 Proposed Order Admitting Sean D. Reyes Pro Hac Vice)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Frank, Daniel)
June 12, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel B Frank on behalf of State of Utah Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Frank, Daniel)
June 12, 2015 (63 in 2:15-cv-00043-SWS) MOTION (Non-Dispositive) REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sds)
June 10, 2015 Filing 56 ERRATA by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Errata Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Emrich, Andrew)
June 9, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory M Cowan on behalf of Wyoming County Commissioners Association Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Cowan, Gregory)
June 9, 2015 Filing 54 AMENDED NOTICE of HEARING Regarding the Motion hearing set before the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl on Petitioners IPAA and Western Energy Alliances Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 11 in 15-CV-041-S), Petitioners Wyoming and Colorados Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 32 in 15-CV-043-S), and Intervenor-Petitioner North Dakotas Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 52 in 15-CV-043-S). Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Casper Courtroom No. 2 before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Each side (Petitioners/Intervenor-Petitioners and Respondents/Intervenor-Respondents) will be allowed 3 hours for presentation of argument and/or testimony (6 hours total), to be divided as counsel see fit. Any response to North Dakotas Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed no later than 6/19/2015. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Court Staff, sds)
June 8, 2015 Filing 53 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Moton for Preliminary Junction (Doc 20 in 15-cv-41-S) and in Support of own Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc 11 and 13 in 15-cv-041-S) filed by Petitioners Independent Petroleum Association of America, Western Energy Alliance. Document was filed in 15-cv-41-S on 6/8/15. (Court Staff, sds)
June 8, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A Letter from State Petitioners, #3 Exhibit B Letter from Solicitor, #4 Exhibit C Affidavit Helms Declaration, #5 Exhibit D Affidavit Schatz Declaration, #6 Exhibit E Affidavit Roller Declaration, #7 Exhibit F Affidavit Schmidt Declaration)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Emrich, Andrew) Modified on 6/9/2015 - relabeled exhibits. (Court Staff, sjc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2015: #8 Modified/Corrected Motion for Preliminary Instruction filed byNorth Dakota) (Court Staff, sds).
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (38) Wyoming County Commissioners Association's Unopposed Motion to participate as Amicus Curiae in support of Wyoming and Colorado's Motino for Preliminary Injunction in case 2:15-cv-00041-SWS. (also (49) in case 2:15-cv-00043-SWS).Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sal)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (47) Motion to File Excess Pages. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sjg)
June 5, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order for leave to file Amicus Brief filed by Movant Wyoming County Commissioners Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Cowan, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting (46) Motion to Respond to Industry Petitioners' Preliminary Injunction Motion and to Exceed Page Limits. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Court Staff, sds)
June 5, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS(Emrich, Andrew)
June 4, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION TO RESPOND TO INDUSTRY PETITIONERS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION AND EXCEED PAGE LIMITS filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified on 6/5/2015 - corrected title (Court Staff, sjc).
June 4, 2015 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re (11 in 2:15-cv-00041-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3, #4 Appendix Part 4, #5 Appendix Part 5) Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, 2:15-cv-00041-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified on 6/4/2015 - corrected document related to as it was not an option for the filer. (Court Staff, sjc). Modified on 6/5/2015 - corrected title. (Court Staff, sjc).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Civil Case, 2:15-cv-00043-SWS, is now the lead case in the consolidation of these matters, to which all future filings should be made. (Court Staff, sds)
June 3, 2015 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial (Unopposed) filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gerard, William)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #38 Motion to Intervene (Court Staff, szr)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #37 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Nathan Douglas Matthews for Sierra Club (Court Staff, szr)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #36 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting R. Benjamin Nelson for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society (Court Staff, szr)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #35 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Michael S. Freeman for Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates and Wilderness Society (Court Staff, szr)
June 2, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Nathan Maxon filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proposed Order)(Maxon, Nathan)
June 2, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Nathan Matthews to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxon, Nathan)
June 2, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for R. Benjamin Nelson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxon, Nathan)
June 2, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxon, Nathan)
June 2, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Maxon on behalf of Conservation Colorado Education Fund, Earthworks, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Resource Advocates, Wilderness Society (Maxon, Nathan)
June 1, 2015 Filing 33 (Text Only)Order Setting Hearing on #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2015 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. The Court also advises counsel and parties the response to Wyoming and Colorado's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due no later than June 12, 2015. (Court Staff, sds)
May 29, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioners State of Colorado, State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Wyoming and Colorado's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Kropatsch, #3 Affidavit of Noble)(Gross, Jeremy) (Additional attachment(s) added at the directive of Counsel on 5/29/2015: #4 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stbd).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting David A. Carson for United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior and United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Court Staff, szr)
May 21, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David A. Carson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 22, 2015 Filing 110 FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by State of Colorado, State of Wyoming (originally filed as additional attachment to motion to intervene doc #26 ). (Court Staff, sjc)
April 22, 2015 Filing 109 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by State of North Dakota (originally filed as additional attachment to motion to intervene doc #6 ). (Court Staff, sjc)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #26 MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Review to join additional petitioners filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. The State of Colorado is hereby joined as a Petitioner in this action.(Court Staff, sal)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 State of North Dakota's Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Petitioner.(Court Staff, sal)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #25 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Frederick R. Yarger for State of Colorado.(Court Staff, sal)
April 21, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Review , filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Petition for Review, #2 Proposed Order)(McGrady, Michael)
April 21, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Frederick R. Yarger to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuhlmann, Andrew)
April 21, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew J Kuhlmann on behalf of State of Colorado (Kuhlmann, Andrew)
April 15, 2015 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. United States Department of the Interior Secretary served on 4/3/2015, answer due on 6/2/2015. Served through the Sally Jewell, Secretary of the U.S. Dept. of the Interior. (McGrady, Michael)
April 15, 2015 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. United States Bureau of Land Management Director served on 3/31/2015, answer due on 6/1/2015. Served through the Neil Kornze, Bureau of Land Management Director. (McGrady, Michael)
April 15, 2015 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. United States Department of the Interior served on 3/31/2015, answer due on 6/1/2015. Served through the United States Department of the Interior. (McGrady, Michael)
April 15, 2015 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Wyoming. United States Bureau of Land Management served on 3/31/2015, answer due on 6/1/2015. Served through the U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (McGrady, Michael)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting William E. Gerard for United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director, United States Department of the Interior and United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Court Staff, szr)
April 15, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for William E. Gerard to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William E. Gerard, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 15, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 6, 2015 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Seby, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1053105 re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Emrich, Andrew)
April 6, 2015 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Lauren R Caplan, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1053300 re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Emrich, Andrew)
April 6, 2015 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Wayne Stenehjem, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1053304 re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Emrich, Andrew)
April 6, 2015 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Matthew A Sagsveen, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1053308 re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Emrich, Andrew)
April 6, 2015 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Hope Hogan, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1053311 re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Emrich, Andrew)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #11 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Hope Hogan for State of North Dakota (Court Staff, szr)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #10 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Matthew A Sagsveen for State of North Dakota (Court Staff, szr)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Wayne Stenehjem for State of North Dakota (Court Staff, szr)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Lauren R Caplan for State of North Dakota (Court Staff, szr)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #7 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Paul M Seby for State of North Dakota (Court Staff, szr)
April 1, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Hope Hogan to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Emrich, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Matthew A Sagsveen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Emrich, Andrew) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/2/2015) (Court Staff, sds).
April 1, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Wayne Stenehjem to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Emrich, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Lauren R Caplan to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Emrich, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Paul M Seby to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Emrich, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene As A Petitioner filed by Petitioner-Interenor State of North Dakota, attorney Andrew C Emrich appearing for State of North Dakota, filed by Intervenor Petitioner State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit)(Emrich, Andrew)
April 1, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew C Emrich on behalf of State of North Dakota (Emrich, Andrew)
March 26, 2015 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming, 4 issued. (Court Staff, skl)
March 26, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy A Gross on behalf of State of Wyoming. (Court Staff, skl)
March 26, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Micheal J McGrady on behalf of State of Wyoming. (Court Staff, skl)
March 26, 2015 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY021542.), filed by State of Wyoming. Magistrate consent sent to Respondent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Wyoming v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management Director
Represented By: David A Carson
Represented By: Jody H Schwarz
Represented By: William E Gerard
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Represented By: Stephen R Terrell
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: David A Carson
Represented By: Jody H Schwarz
Represented By: William E Gerard
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Represented By: Stephen R Terrell
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sally Jewell
Represented By: David A Carson
Represented By: Jody H Schwarz
Represented By: William E Gerard
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Represented By: Stephen R Terrell
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: David A Carson
Represented By: Jody H Schwarz
Represented By: William E Gerard
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Represented By: Stephen R Terrell
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Neil Kornze
Represented By: David A Carson
Represented By: Jody H Schwarz
Represented By: William E Gerard
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Represented By: Stephen R Terrell
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Ute Indian Tribe
Represented By: Jeremy J Patterson
Represented By: Jeffrey S Rasmussen
Represented By: Christopher J Reagen
Represented By: Scott P Klosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wilderness Society
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Western Resource Advocates
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Utah
Represented By: John Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Steven F Alder
Represented By: Daniel B Frank
Represented By: Sean D Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Matthew A Sagsveen
Represented By: Wayne Stenehjem
Represented By: Paul M Seby
Represented By: Lauren R Caplan
Represented By: Hope Hogan
Represented By: Andrew C Emrich
Represented By: Robert John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Conservation Colorado Education Fund
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Earthworks
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Sierra Club
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Joel Minor
Represented By: Nathan Maxon
Represented By: R Benjamin Nelson
Represented By: Nathan Douglas Matthews
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Colorado
Represented By: Eva La
Represented By: Glenn E Roper
Represented By: Andrew J Kuhlmann
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Represented By: Maegan L Woita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wyoming County Commissioners Association
Represented By: Gregory M Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?