Center for Biological Diversity et al v. United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services et al

Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator, United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services and Janet L Bucknall
Intervenor Defendant: State of Wyoming
Case Number: 2:2019cv00020
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #12 Motion to Intervene. Intervenor-Defendant State of Wyoming added on 3/22/19. (Court Staff, szf)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 Motion to Intervene filed by Movant State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (DeWald, D)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming filed by Movant State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeWald, D)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D David DeWald on behalf of State of Wyoming (DeWald, D)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik Edward Petersen on behalf of State of Wyoming (Petersen, Erik)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Erika Norman for United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services and United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Erica Norman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services, United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services, United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator (Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Western Watersheds Project. United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services served on 2/25/2019, answer due on 4/26/2019; United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator served on 2/25/2019, answer due on 4/26/2019. Served through the USDA APHIS Wildlife Services, Deputy Administrator Janet L. Bucknall, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Santarsiere, Andrea)
February 8, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Collette Adkins. Receipt CHY030354. (Court Staff, sjk)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Collette Adkins for Center for Biological Diversity,Collette Adkins for Western Watersheds Project,Collette Adkins for WildEarth Guardians (Court Staff, sal)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Collette L. Adkins to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Collette Adkins, #2 Proposed Order)(Santarsiere, Andrea)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians. (Court Staff, sal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L Santarsiere on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians (Court Staff, sal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (summonses issued) (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY030273) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (Court Staff, szf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services Deputy Administrator
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Erika Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Wildlife Services
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Erika Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet L Bucknall
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Erika Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Andrea L Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Andrea L Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Andrea L Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Represented By: D David DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?