WildEarth Guardians v. United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director et al

Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Defendant: United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director, United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director, David Berry and Glenda Owens
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Michelle-Ann C Williams for United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director and United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director (Court Staff, szf)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michelle-Ann C. Williams to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director, United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gross, Jeremy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy A Gross on behalf of United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director, United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director (Gross, Jeremy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians re #1 Complaint Service on Attorney General and U.S Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Zars, Reed)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians.. Served through the David Berry, OSMRE. Served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Zars, Reed) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians.. Served through the Glenda Owens, OSMRE. Served on 2/19/2019, answer due on 4/22/2019 (Zars, Reed) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR COUNSEL WILL REFILE SUMMONS Returned Executed by WildEarth Guardians. United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director served on 2/19/2019, answer due on 4/22/2019; United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director served on 2/15/2019, answer due on 4/16/2019. Served through the Glenda Owens, OSMRE. (Zars, Reed) Modified on 3/12/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Samantha Ruscavage-Barz for WildEarth Guardians by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
February 12, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Samantha Ruscavage-Barz. Receipt CHY030375. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Samantha Ruscavage-Barz to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Zars, Reed)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (two summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy030357.), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WildEarth Guardians v. United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C Williams
Represented By: Jeremy A Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement's Western Region Director
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C Williams
Represented By: Jeremy A Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berry
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C Williams
Represented By: Jeremy A Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Owens
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C Williams
Represented By: Jeremy A Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Reed Zars
Represented By: Samantha Ruscavage-Barz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?