Friends of Animals v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Secretary, Deb Haaland, United States Bureau of Land Management and Bureau of Land Management
Petitioner: Rock Springs Grazing Association
Case Number: 2:2023cv00117
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY to (34 in 2:23-cv-00084-NDF) Opposition, (32 in 2:23-cv-00084-NDF) Opposition filed by Movant Rock Springs Grazing Association. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00084-NDF, 2:23-cv-00087-NDF, 2:23-cv-00117-NDF (Brooks, Constance)
August 17, 2023 Filing 27 OPPOSITION to (28 in 2:23-cv-00084-NDF) Notice (Other) filed by Consolidated Plaintiff Friends of Animals. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00084-NDF, 2:23-cv-00087-NDF, 2:23-cv-00117-NDF (Huss, Robert)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by the Senior District Judge Nancy D Freudenthal granting #24 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Administrative Purposes. All future filings in this case and 23-CV-87-F shall be filed in 23-CV-84-F.(Court Staff, sal)
August 17, 2023 Filing 25 OPPOSITION to #21 Notice (Other) filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (Smith, Maggie)
August 14, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial (Unopposed) filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Kimberly)
August 7, 2023 Filing 23 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Senior District Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. Following a telephone conference in this matter on this date, the Court orders that the date for filing of the Administrative Record in this matter is hereby extended to September 5, 2023. Additionally the Court will, on its own initiative, reset the Scheduling Conference in this matter at a later date.(Court Staff, sal)
August 7, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held before Senior District Judge Nancy D Freudenthal: Status Conference held on 8/7/2023. (Court Reporter Melanie Sonntag.) (Court Staff, sal)
August 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Movant Rock Springs Grazing Association of Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Motion to Consolidate, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Constance)
August 2, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Constance E Brooks on behalf of Rock Springs Grazing Association Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2292828. (Brooks, Constance)
August 2, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/10/2023, answer due on 9/8/2023; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 7/10/2023, answer due on 9/8/2023. Served through the Nicholas Vassallo/U.S. Attorney's Office - District of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card Receipt, #2 Exhibit Delivery Tracking) (Huss, Robert)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #17 MOTION for Constance E. Brooks to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Movant Rock Springs Grazing Association (order emailed to PHV counsel). (Court Staff, stmo)
August 1, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Constance E. Brooks to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant Rock Springs Grazing Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Bettencourt, Danielle)
August 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Rae Bettencourt on behalf of Rock Springs Grazing Association (Bettencourt, Danielle)
August 1, 2023 Filing 15 FILED INCORRECTLY - will be refiled by counsel. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Friends of Animals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Cards Received) (Huss, Robert) Modified on 8/2/2023 (Court Staff, sal).
July 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing BY TELEPHONE - All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:307/735-3644, Access code 547991460#. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2023 01:30 PM via telephone before Senior District Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST for hearing on Initial Scheduling Conference by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Cullen, Kimberly)
July 20, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Anne Cullen on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Cullen, Kimberly)
July 20, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Maggie Baker Smith on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Smith, Maggie)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 , #9 MOTIONS for Kimberly A. Cullen and Maggie B. Smith to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants United States Department of Interior Secretary, Bureau of Land Management (order emailed to PHV counsel). (Court Staff, stmo)
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Maggie B. Smith to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Maggie B. Smith in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kimberly A. Cullen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Kimberly A. Cullen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Martin, C)
July 11, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Robert Huss on behalf of Friends of Animals Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2281377. (Huss, Robert)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Best on behalf of Friends of Animals Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2279972. (Best, Jennifer)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 MOTION for Jennifer Best and Robert Huss to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiff Friends of Animals (order emailed to PHV counsel) (Court Staff, stmo).
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment MOTION for Jennifer Best and Robert Huss to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Thorpe, Brittany) Text modified to remove erroneous event selected on 7/5/2023 (Court Staff, sal).
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 Summonses Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief (4 summonses issued) (Filing fee $402 receipt #2-1741), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stmo) Modified text on 7/3/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Brittany Nicole Thorpe
Represented By: Jennifer Best
Represented By: Robert Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rock Springs Grazing Association
Represented By: Danielle Rae Bettencourt
Represented By: Constance E Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?