Wyoming Trust Company et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Nancy Butcher (1981), Kurt Hall (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1982), Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Nancy Butcher (1973), Kurt Hall (1973) and Hall Atlas LLC
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director, United States Department of the Interior, Deb Haaland, United States Bureau of Land Management, Tracy Stone Manning, United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office, Tim Hansen, United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation, Kathy Kilgore and Andrew Archuleta
Case Number: 2:2023cv00148
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 1201 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID ON BEHALF OF DOUGLAS PARK AND REZA DIBADJ (total amount received $200 receipt no. 2-2048) (Court Staff, stmo)
September 11, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office Director answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Director answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation Director answer due 11/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director answer due 11/6/2023; United States Department of the Interior answer due 11/6/2023; United States Department of the Interior Secretary answer due 11/6/2023 (Court Staff, szf)
September 11, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service as to United States Attorney's Office by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982) (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Director by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation Director by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office Director by Plaintiffs Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Department of the Interior Secretary by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Department of the Interior by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982).Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023. (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). Served on 9/5/2023, Answer Due 11/6/2023 (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service via Certified Mail as to United States Attorney General by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). (Dibadj, Reza) Modified docket text on 9/13/2023 (Court Staff, szf).
August 30, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued (11) (Court Staff, smxb)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 Praecipe for Summonses filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons) (Thomas, Scranton)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Reza Dibadj on behalf of Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC, Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1982) Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2303283. (Dibadj, Reza)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #2 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting Douglas Park and Reza Dibadj for Plaintiffs. Emailed counsel on this date.(Court Staff, smxb)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Douglas Park and Reza Dibadj to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Butcher (1973), Nancy Butcher (1981), Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Kurt Hall (1982), Hall Atlas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas Park in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Reza Dibadj in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Order Admitting Attorneys Pro Hac Vice)(Thomas, Scranton) Modified to correct docket text on 8/22/2023 (Court Staff, smxb).
August 17, 2023 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. $402 Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: 2-1934. (Court Staff, stmo)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Nancy Butcher (1973), Kurt Hall (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1981), Wyoming Trust Company (1973), Hall Atlas LLC, Nancy Butcher (1982), Kurt Hall (1982), Nancy Butcher (1981), Kurt Hall (1973), Wyoming Trust Company (1982). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyoming Trust Company et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Appraisal and Valuation Services Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management Division of Minerals Evaluation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Trust Company (1981)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Butcher (1981)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Hall (1981)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Trust Company (1982)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Butcher (1982)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Hall (1982)
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Trust Company (1973)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Butcher (1973)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Hall (1973)
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hall Atlas LLC
Represented By: Reza Dibadj
Represented By: Scranton Gregory Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?